Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wong Elizabeth, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Souders J. Scott Esq., against Miller Barondess Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 12, 2018 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time29 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: July 12, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 12, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND/OR REFORMATION
Date: July 12, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER STAYING. ARBITRATION; ETC.
Date: July 13, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 03, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 10, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 16, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 26, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 10, 2018Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: October 26, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.