Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Continental Maintenance Inc., Kim Sang Il, Cusimano Theresa, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Salusky Anna R., against Continental Maintenance Inc., Kim Sang Il, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management108 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2018 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions476 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
SUMMONS -
Date: July 10, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: July 10, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 10, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: July 10, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES
Date: July 18, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 26, 2018PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 01, 2018NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -
Date: August 01, 2018DEFENDANTS CONTINENTAL MAINTENANCE, INC. AND SANG IL KIM'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 22, 2018SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 29, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: October 01, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: October 11, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 26, 2018Case Management Order
Date: October 26, 2018Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: August 06, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: October 28, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: October 29, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (RES ID: 4357))
Date: December 03, 2019Order - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL
Date: December 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 06, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: February 21, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT; DEFENDANT DID NOT APPEAR AT TRIAL
Date: February 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 24, 2020Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: June 17, 2020Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Continental Maintenance, Inc. (Defendant); Sang Kim, ll (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Document:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial (2 days); Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Res ID: 4357))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Continental Maintenance, Inc. (Defendant); Sang Il Kim (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel ((Res ID: 4357)) Filed by Anna R. Salusky (Attorney)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Continental Maintenance, Inc. (Defendant); Sang Il Kim (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Submission of Proposed Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Summons Filed by Continental Maintenance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Sang Il Kim (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Judgment (By Court; Defendant Did Not Appear at Trial) Filed by Sang Il Kim (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Continental Maintenance, Inc. (Defendant); Sang Il Kim (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by Theresa Cusimano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment) Filed by Sang Il Kim (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Anna Salusky Mahoney In Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Res ID: 4357)))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 01/06/2020)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial (2 days); Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as...))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Submission of Proposed Judgment) of 02/21/2020)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel ((Res ID: 4357))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Submission of Proposed Judgment))
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Order (Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Civil)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Judgment (By Court; Defendant Did Not Appear at Trial)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.