Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Padron Felicitas, Valdivia Marcela, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ammirato Vincent Salvatore, against Kharazyan Abraam, represented by Gillard Gerald, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 03, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions766 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Summons -
Date: July 03, 2018Complaint -
Date: July 03, 2018CoverSheet -
Date: July 03, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: July 03, 2018Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 22, 2019Answer
Date: January 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: December 16, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020
Date: March 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VINCENT S. AMMIRATO
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: August 04, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 04, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL))
Date: September 09, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION DEF'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: November 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE...)
Date: November 20, 2020Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)
Date: November 24, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL))
Date: January 06, 2021Order - Dismissal
Date: January 06, 2021Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Abraam Kharazyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Felicitas Padron (Plaintiff); Marcela Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Felicitas Padron (Plaintiff); Marcela Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Abraam Kharazyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Summons Filed by Felicitas Padron (Plaintiff); Marcela Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Felicitas Padron (Plaintiff); Marcela Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 06, 2021Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Felicitas Padron (Plaintiff); Marcela Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Felicitas Padron (Plaintiff); Marcela Valdivia (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Felicitas Padron (Plaintiff); Marcela Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Felicitas Padron (Plaintiff); Marcela Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Abraam Kharazyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Felicitas Padron (Plaintiff); Marcela Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Felicitas Padron (Plaintiff); Marcela Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by Abraam Kharazyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((not entered))
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause...))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional)))
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 12/16/2019)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Vincent S. Ammirato)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Opposition (Def's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce settlement Agreement)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional)))
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.