Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KRISHNA AND SHEILA FAMILY PARTNERSHIP VS MEDICLEAN LINEN & L
On July 02, 2018 a breach of rental/lease contract (not unlawful detainer or wrongful eviction) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 07, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Breach of Rental/Lease Contract (not unlawful detainer or wrongful eviction) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Case Outcome Type
Legacy Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
3 months and 0 days
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
(1) BREACH OF CONTRACT
(2) BREACH OF EQUIPMENT LEASE
(3) OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; ACCOUNT
(4) MONEY HAD AND RECEIVED
(5) REASONABLE VALUE OF
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2018 | Judgment | ||
October 02, 2018 | Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00 | ||
October 02, 2018 | Stipulation for Judgment - Stipulation for Judgment Stipulation for Entry of Judgment | ||
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Judgment (Stipulation for Entry of Judgment) Filed by Krishna and Sheila Family Partnership (Plaintiff) |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Krishna and Sheila Family Partnership (Plaintiff) |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed by Krishna and Sheila Family Partnership (Plaintiff) |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Krishna and Sheila Family Partnership (Plaintiff) |
|
September 12, 2018 | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - | ||
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) | |
August 21, 2018 | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT | ||
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Unknown Event Type |
|
August 10, 2018 | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | ||
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
July 27, 2018 | DEFENDANT MEDICLEAN LINEN&LAUNDRY INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | ||
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Mediclean Linen & Laundry Inc. (Defendant) |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MEDICLEAN LINEN&LAUNDRY INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
July 16, 2018 | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Krishna and Sheila Family Partnership (Plaintiff) |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 10, 2018 | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
July 02, 2018 | SUMMONS - | ||
July 02, 2018 | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC | ||
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Krishna and Sheila Family Partnership (Plaintiff) |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC |