Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Feuer Michael N. City Attorney, against Agape Funeral Home Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory W. Alarcon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2018 |
CategoryOther Commercial Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions27 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time27 days |
Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: July 19, 2018Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: June 22, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 22, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Date: June 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL
Date: June 27, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 12, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: July 12, 2018NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL
Date: July 16, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: July 17, 2018STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: July 19, 2018Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Judgment
Date: July 19, 2018OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.