Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lee Mee Hyun, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ra & Associates Apc, against New Penn Financial Llc, Peak Foreclosure Services Inc., Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, represented by Krishel Law Offices, Wright Finlay & Zak Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Terry Green presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 22, 2018 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time146 days |
Complaint
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: August 01, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00
Date: August 30, 2018Stipulation
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Ex-parte Request for Order
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2018Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: November 15, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-09-11 00:00:00
Date: September 11, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.