Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Salib Mina, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Ghaleb Alan Magdi Esq., against Guice Michael J. M.D., Michael Guice Md Inc., represented by Metros Kevin Lee Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 22, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Mina Salib (Plaintiff); As to: Michael J. M.D. Guice (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael J. M.D. Guice (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Filed by the Plaintiff For Or...)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael J. M.D. Guice (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Michael J. M.D. Guice (Defendant)
Date: November 13, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Michael J. M.D. Guice (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: June 22, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. PROSFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: June 22, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: September 13, 2018DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: September 14, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: September 14, 2018NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES
Date: September 14, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2018DEMAND THAT DEFENSE OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS BE TRIED SEPARATELY CODE CIVIL PROCEDURE 597.5
Date: September 14, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL (W/O PREJUDICE)
Date: September 18, 2018Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: December 27, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 19, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL
Date: March 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 06, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: June 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: July 24, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 30, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: November 13, 2020Notice
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Filed by the Plaintiff For Or...))
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant, Michael J. Guice, M.D.'s Motion for Iss...))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, FSC, and All Related Dates Pursuant to Stipulation)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing Trial)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Michael J. Guice, M.D.?s Ex Parte Applic...))
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.