Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Aghamiri Babak, Jalili Farah, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bunch Bruce M., against Moghaddam Mohsen T. M.D., Tarzana Multi-Specialty Center, represented by Law Yuk Kwong, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2018 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions626 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time716 days |
ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -
Date: June 04, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM
Date: June 04, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: June 04, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 18, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 02, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 18, 2019Answer
Date: December 18, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRUCE M. BUNCH RE OSC AND PROPOSED ORDER
Date: January 08, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: February 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)
Date: February 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 28, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2020
Date: April 28, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: May 12, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: May 20, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: May 20, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/28/2020)
Date: April 28, 2020Declaration (of Bruce M. Bunch re OSC and Proposed Order)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: April 28, 2020Notice (Notice of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: May 12, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.