Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hernandez Juana Eustolia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Parnell Stephen, Zolonz Adam M. Esq., against Kia Motors America Inc., represented by Tarczy Benjamin R, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management131 days |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions42 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Juana Eustolia Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Juana Eustolia Hernandez (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Juana Eustolia Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Juana Eustolia Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Juana Eustolia Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Notice Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Juana Eustolia Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Juana Eustolia Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Juana Eustolia Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Juana Eustolia Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Juana Eustolia Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: December 11, 2020SUMMONS -
Date: May 31, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: May 31, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: June 13, 2018KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: July 12, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 26, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 01, 2018NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION; EXHIBITS 4-5 (PART 2 OF 2)
Date: September 06, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 01, 2018NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION; EXHIBITS 1-3 (PART 1 OF 2)
Date: September 06, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 24, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 14, 2018Notice of Posting of Jury Fees -
Date: October 09, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 16, 2018Minute Order - (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 09, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 14, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 07, 2019Notice - Notice Notice of Hearing
Date: January 10, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: January 29, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 25, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
Date: February 08, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 13, 2019Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE OF MANUEL CAHERO
Date: October 31, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING
Date: March 18, 2019Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDENCE OF SERVICE TECHNICIAN 200080
Date: October 31, 2019Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDENCE OF KIA DTLA'S PMK
Date: October 31, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ...)
Date: November 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 22, 2019Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 27, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: December 13, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: December 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: February 26, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: April 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020
Date: April 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020
Date: April 23, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: July 07, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: July 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 06, 2020Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: August 17, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN P. TARCZY RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW RE DISMISSAL
Date: September 01, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: September 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)
Date: September 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND...)
Date: November 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/12/2020
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 12, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)
Date: December 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: December 23, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT
Date: January 06, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 11, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel (ATTENDENCE OF SERVICE TECHNICIAN 200080)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel (ATTENDANCE OF MANUEL CAHERO)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING AND SHORTENING TIME)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/23/2020)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/22/2020)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF RULING)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel (ATTENDENCE OF KIA DTLA'S PMK)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/08/2019)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ...))
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause ...))
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Benjamin P. Tarczy re Failure to Appear at Order to Show re Dismissal)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time and...))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition by Defendant to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; Order to Show ...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Motion re: (Plaintiff's Second Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce Order and for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause ...))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/12/2020)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Benjamin P. Tarczy re Failure to Appear at Order to Show Cause re Dismissal)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Stephen Parnell in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement and Order)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.