Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cortez Joseph L., filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Tamraz Joel F., against Cit Of Los Angeles, City Of Los Angeles, Seaside Water Company, Sepulveda Roman O., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ruth Ann Kwan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2018 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions324 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference re: defendant Seaside Water Company) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Joseph L. Cortez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Default Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Joseph L. Cortez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Declaration In Support of; Filed by: Joseph L. Cortez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Proposed Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Seaside Water Company (Defendant)
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 03, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Default Prove Up Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Joseph L. Cortez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Joseph L. Cortez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: COVID-19 continuance;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Declaration of Joel F. Tamraz Re: Service of Complaint; Filed by: Joseph L. Cortez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Default entered as to Seaside Water Company; On the Complaint filed by JOSEPH L CORTEZ on
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE
Date: May 29, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: May 29, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 06, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: July 06, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 16, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)
Date: December 18, 2018Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: April 17, 2019Order - Dismissal
Date: April 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 31, 2019Notice - NOTICE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 18, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: July 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: August 21, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: September 23, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 31, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: December 02, 2019Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 11, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: January 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: January 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; DEFAUL...)
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19 CONTINUANCE;)
Date: May 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF DEFAULT PROVE UP;)
Date: July 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: ENTRY O...)
Date: November 30, 2020RETURNED MAIL
Date: December 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: April 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: April 13, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF
Date: April 26, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 07, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: June 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)
Date: August 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)
Date: August 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: November 03, 2021Judgment
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: November 03, 2021Complaint
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Joel F. Tamraz Re: Service of Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Notice (case management conference)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as to defendant City of Los...))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Re: entry of default))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Re: entry...))
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Re: entry of default))
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Re: entry of default))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Re: entry of default))
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Re: entry of default))
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: COVID-19 continuance;) of 05/04/2020)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry of default judgment; Defaul...))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Re: entry of default))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: COVID-19 continuance;))
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuance of default prove up;))
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Default Prove Up Hearing) of 08/06/2021)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing; Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry o...))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing; Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry o...))
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing; Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry o...))
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re: defendant Seaside Water Company) of 07/14/2021)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing; Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry o...))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: defendant Seaside Water Company))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference Re: Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing; Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry o...))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Default Judgment) of 04/13/2021)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (OF JOEL F. TAMRAZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING FOR 30 DAYS)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing))
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Proposed Judgment))
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Proposed Judgment) of 09/27/2021)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order -
Date: July 30, 2018OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 24, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 26, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Joel F. Tamraz Re: Service of Complaint
Date: November 05, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)
Date: November 05, 2018Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.