Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Christopher Damesha, Leon Ashley, Miller James, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Gutierrez Rolando J, Gutierrez Rolando Juvenal, Kielty Thomas W, Mclachlan Michael D, against Ls And Partners At Lax Llc, Ls & Partners@Ca Llc, Paradies Lagardere @ Laxf&B Llc, Paradies Lagardere @ Lax Llc, represented by Fairchild Jillian M, Lindell Gina Haggerty, Michitsch Justin M, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management208 days |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Objection To Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena; Filed by: James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: James Miller (Plaintiff); Charge Fee ?: YES
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: LS & Partners@CA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Motion To Quash Subpoena; Filed by: LS & Partners@CA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Declaration James Miller; Filed by: James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Declaration Michael McLachlan; Filed by: James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LS & Partners@CA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: LS & Partners@CA, LLC (Defendant); Paradies Lagardere @ LAX(F&B), LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Notice Of Status Conference Hearing; Filed by: James Miller (Plaintiff); As to: James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case - BC707660
Date: May 25, 2018Complaint -
Date: May 25, 2018Notice of Related Case -
Date: May 25, 2018Summons - BC707660
Date: May 25, 2018Summons -
Date: May 25, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 05, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 08, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Date: June 19, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 26, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 02, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 19, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 19, 2018NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: August 16, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 22, 2018NOTICE OF COURT ORDER VACATING DATES
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Remand from Federal Court
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Related Case
Date: October 17, 2018Notice - Notice of Federal Court's Order of Remand of Matter to State Court
Date: October 23, 2018Answer
Date: October 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
Date: October 29, 2018Motion to Quash - Motion To Quash Subpoena
Date: November 09, 2018Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: November 14, 2018Notice - Notice of Stipulation of the Parties for Filing First Amended Complaint
Date: November 14, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 04, 2018Answer
Date: December 13, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 14, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: December 19, 2018Separate Statement
Date: January 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 22, 2019Objection - Objection To Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena
Date: January 22, 2019Declaration - Declaration Michael McLachlan
Date: January 22, 2019Declaration - Declaration James Miller
Date: January 22, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production...)
Date: February 04, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 04, 2019Response - Response Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement
Date: February 21, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 22, 2019Other - - PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET)
Date: March 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 11, 2019Notice - NOTICE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 17, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 02, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 05, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: July 17, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF OUTCOME OF JULY 22, 2019 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 23, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 01, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 21, 2019Case Management Order
Date: October 21, 2019Answer
Date: August 30, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEYS
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 21, 2022Joint Status Conference Report
Date: August 24, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING
Date: October 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STAY)
Date: October 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STAY)
Date: April 11, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Motion To Quash Subpoena Filed by LS & Partners@CA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by LS & Partners@CA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LS & Partners@CA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order on Joint Stipulation and Order Re: ALLOWING DEFEN...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (James Miller) Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Objection (To Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena) Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Declaration (Michael McLachlan) Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting Hearing on Joint Stipulation to Conti...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: ,incluldi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: December 23, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: May 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE CONTINUING TRIAL AND CASE DEADLINES
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM AFFILIATION
Date: July 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF OUTCOME OF SETTLEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 27, 2021
Date: October 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT)
Date: October 27, 2021Complaint Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff); Ashley Leon (Plaintiff); Damesha Christopher (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice (Of Status Conference Hearing) Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: STAY)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Motion To Quash Subpoena
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Declaration (Michael McLachlan)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (On defendants' motion to quash and case management conference)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Notice (of Stipulation of the Parties for Filing First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production...))
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Response (Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice (of Federal Court's Order of Remand of Matter to State Court)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Declaration (James Miller)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Objection (To Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proposed Order (Cover Sheet)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER RE CONTINUING TRIAL AND CASE DEADLINES)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Setting Hearing on Joint Stipulation to Conti...) of )
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND CASE DEADLINES)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: ,incluldi...))
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Order (Denying Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena for Production of Records to Unite Here, Local 11)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice ( of Outcome of July 22, 2019 Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Settlement))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Re: Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Law Firm Affiliation)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order on Joint Stipulation and Order Re: ALLOWING DEFEN...) of )
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Notice (of Outcome of Settlement Status Conference on October 27, 2021)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting Hearing on Joint Stipulation to Conti...))
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEYS)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (DEFENDANTS' FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order on Joint Stipulation and Order Re: ALLOWING DEFEN...))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice (of Federal Court's Order of Remand of Matter to State Court)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/29/2018)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice (of Stipulation of the Parties for Filing First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Declaration (Michael McLachlan)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (James Miller)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (On defendants' motion to quash and case management conference)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER RE CONTINUING TRIAL AND CASE DEADLINES)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice ( of Outcome of July 22, 2019 Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND CASE DEADLINES)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Proposed Order (Cover Sheet)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Objection (To Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Response (Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: ,incluldi...))
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Order (Denying Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena for Production of Records to Unite Here, Local 11)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production...))
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice (of Outcome of Settlement Status Conference on October 27, 2021)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order on Joint Stipulation and Order Re: ALLOWING DEFEN...))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Re: Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEYS)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Law Firm Affiliation)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (DEFENDANTS' FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Settlement))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Stipulation and Request for Continuance...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by LS & Partners@CA, LLC (Defendant); Paradies Lagardere @ LAX(F&B), LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.