Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Antelope Valley-East Kern Water Agency, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Brunick William John, Mcelhaney Leland Paul, against Barrera Ida V., Barrera Natalio T., Bernales Mary Jane, Bernales Robert B., Fernandez Amelia M., (total of 9) See All represented by Delorme Lisa A Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management207 days |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2018 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Condemnation (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions125 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time307 days |
COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: May 24, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: May 24, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 31, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: June 15, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 15, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 02, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 02, 2018ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: August 03, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 09, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 09, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 10, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 23, 2018NOTICE OF DEPOSIT (CODE OF CIV. PROC. SECTION 1255.020)
Date: September 11, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: September 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order To Show Cause Why All 35 Cases Should Not Be Related)
Date: December 08, 2018Motion for Order - Motion for Order for Refund to Plaintiff of Deposit With State Treasury
Date: December 24, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: December 17, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)
Date: February 01, 2019Order - Order For Refund to Plaintiff Of Deposit With State Treasury
Date: February 15, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: March 27, 2019Case Management Order
Date: April 05, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Order (For Refund to Plaintiff Of Deposit With State Treasury)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 27, 2019Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why All 33 Cases Should Not Be Related))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Motion for Order (for Refund to Plaintiff of Deposit With State Treasury)
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order To Show Cause Why All 35 Cases Should Not Be Related))
Date: 2018-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: April 05, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.