Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Antelope Valley East Kern Water Agency, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Brunick William John, Evertz Douglas Jay, Madueno Emily Louise, Mcelhaney Leland Paul, against All Persons Unknown Claiming An Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint, Castillo Abraham L., Castillo Francisca T., Southern California Edison Company, represented by Cummings Charles D, Pranata D Daniel, Jakubowski Karyn Alycia, Kovacic Gary Anton, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management95 days |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2018 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Condemnation (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions103 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Motion for Order Of Possession; Filed by: Antelope Valley East Kern Water Agency (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Order For Possession Pursuant To CCP ¿1255.460; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Antelope Valley East Kern Water Agency (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Antelope Valley East Kern Water Agency (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: May 24, 2018COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: May 24, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 29, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 02, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 18, 2018ANSVER OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: August 02, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 02, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 27, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 09, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: September 04, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: September 18, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: October 02, 2018Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 18, 2018Answer - Answer to Complaint in Eminent Domain
Date: November 07, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY ALL 33 CASES SHOULD NOT BE RELATED)
Date: November 27, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion Hearing)
Date: November 29, 2018Case Management Order
Date: November 27, 2018Status Report - Status Report Re its Motion for Pre-Judgment Possession
Date: December 05, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order To Show Cause Why All 35 Cases Should Not Be Related)
Date: December 08, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Order of Po...)
Date: December 17, 2018Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 22, 2019Order - Order For Possession Pursuant To CCP §1255.460
Date: December 19, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)
Date: February 01, 2019Application for Withdrawal of Funds on Deposit
Date: March 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 05, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEFENDANTS' LIST OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: April 09, 2019Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS' LIST OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: April 09, 2019Witness List
Date: April 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: May 03, 2019Order - ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT
Date: June 18, 2019Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR TRIAL
Date: July 25, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: September 11, 2019Case Management Order
Date: September 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: MOTION BY PLAINTIFF (ANTELOPE VA...)
Date: September 23, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 25, 2019Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF TAX INFORMATION
Date: October 08, 2019Notice - NOTICE FINAL OFFER OF COMPENSATION BY PLAINTIFF ANTELOPE VALLEY-EAST KERN WATER AGENCY
Date: November 13, 2019Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS' FINAL DEMAND FOR JUST COMPENSATION
Date: November 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION IN LIMINE , IF ANY; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 21, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/14/2020
Date: August 14, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR ALL ...)
Date: September 08, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/23/2020
Date: November 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 23, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: January 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RESETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING A...)
Date: February 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: October 15, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Trial - NOTICE OF TRIAL FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT
Date: November 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: November 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: January 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: June 06, 2022Summary of the Case
Date: June 15, 2022Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGMENT
Date: June 15, 2022Judgment
Date: June 20, 2022Stipulated Judgment
Date: June 20, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION
Date: June 23, 2022Brief Defendants' Final Demand for Just Compensation; Filed by: Abraham L. Castillo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint in Eminent Domain)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why All 33 Cases Should Not Be Related))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order To Show Cause Why All 35 Cases Should Not Be Related))
Date: 2018-12-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Application for Withdrawal of Funds on Deposit
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Order of Po...))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion Hearing))
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Motion for Order (Of Possession)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Status Report (Re its Motion for Pre-Judgment Possession)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Order (For Withdrawal Of Deposit)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion for Order (CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR TRIAL)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Defendants' List of Expert Witnesses)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 1-...))
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Certificate ( Of Tax Information)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave To Supplement List of Expert Witn...))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice (Final offer of compensation by plaintiff Antelope Valley-East Kern Water AGency)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice (OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Brief (Defendants' List of Expert Witnesses)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC for Plaintiff's Experts; Hearing o...))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: MOTION BY PLAINTIFF (ANTELOPE VA...))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Motion for Leave (To Supplement List of Expert Witnesses)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Brief (Defendants' Final Demand for Just Compensation)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine , if any; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order for Publication (for "Unknown Person Claiming, et al")
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Case Management Conference For All ...))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE (Dates Remain))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re: Resetting Evidentiary Hearing a...))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Trial (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re: Resetting Evidentiary Hearing a...))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement))
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine of Plaintiff AVEK No. 1-3; Hearin...))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice (OF: (1) VACATING: (A) EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS; AND (B) TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; AND)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Motion for Order (Of Possession)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint in Eminent Domain)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why All 33 Cases Should Not Be Related))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order To Show Cause Why All 35 Cases Should Not Be Related))
Date: 2018-12-08T00:00:00Status Report (Re its Motion for Pre-Judgment Possession)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion Hearing))
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Order of Po...))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Brief (Defendants' List of Expert Witnesses)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Defendants' List of Expert Witnesses)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Order (For Withdrawal Of Deposit)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Order for Publication (for "Unknown Person Claiming, et al")
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice (OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Motion for Order (CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR TRIAL)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: MOTION BY PLAINTIFF (ANTELOPE VA...))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Motion for Leave (To Supplement List of Expert Witnesses)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice (Final offer of compensation by plaintiff Antelope Valley-East Kern Water AGency)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Certificate ( Of Tax Information)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Brief (Defendants' Final Demand for Just Compensation)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine , if any; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave To Supplement List of Expert Witn...))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 1-...))
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Case Management Conference For All ...))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC for Plaintiff's Experts; Hearing o...))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/14/2020)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice (OF: (1) VACATING: (A) EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS; AND (B) TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; AND)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE (Dates Remain))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re: Resetting Evidentiary Hearing a...))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/23/2020)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/15/2021)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re: Resetting Evidentiary Hearing a...))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Trial (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine of Plaintiff AVEK No. 1-3; Hearin...))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.