Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Power Elixir Llc, + Red Elixir Llc, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Blair John, represented by Tukhi Faheem A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard L. Fruin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2018 |
CategoryTortious Interference (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions210 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time248 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: June 28, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 11, 2018DEFENDANT JOHN BLAIR'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT, ETC.
Date: August 14, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 12, 2018RULING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT JOHN BLAIR TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: September 25, 2018Minute Order - (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 09, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 31, 2018Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: November 30, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS)
Date: December 18, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: December 28, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff for Leave to Ame...)
Date: December 28, 2018Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for motion to file leave of amended complaint
Date: December 28, 2018Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order re Pending Dismissal
Date: January 15, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: January 25, 2019Plaintiff's Request for Punitive Damages
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS)])
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS))
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion to Dismiss by Defendant John Blair as to Plaintiff's C...))
Date: January 25, 2019Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [181129369507]
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amen...))
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Pending Dismissal)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: January 25, 2019Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff for Leave to Ame...))
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.