Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Penn Alexander, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Davis Louise Cooley Md, Specialty Surgical Center Of Beverly Hill, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 18, 2018 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time341 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: June 12, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2018Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - FIRST AMENDED
Date: August 14, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: April 24, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: August 14, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: April 24, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.