Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Outlaw Laboratory Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Smith Matthew J., against 6Th Ave Liquor Doe 26, 76, 777 Market Inc., 911 Food Mart Doe 20, Aero Liquor & Junior Market, (total of 48) See All represented by Akinyemi Wole, Bleau Thomas P., Roberts Kenneth P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Linfield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management145 days |
Filing DateMay 24, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions19 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time152 days |
COMPLAINT FOR: 1) UNFAIR COMPETITION (BUS. & PROF. CODE 17200, ET SEQ.) ;ETC
Date: May 24, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: May 25, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 07, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: June 12, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: June 12, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: June 15, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 10, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: July 16, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 18, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: July 19, 2018ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: July 23, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: July 24, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -
Date: July 31, 2018ANSWER-CONTRACT -
Date: July 31, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 01, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 08, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 17, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 21, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: August 31, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 14, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 17, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: September 19, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: September 26, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 27, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 28, 2018Reply -
Date: October 09, 2018OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF OVERLAND MOBIL MART AND MV PETROLEUM CORP.
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling on Demurrer to Complaint
Date: October 23, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: October 23, 2018Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEMURRER
Date: October 15, 2018Order - Order Re Ruling
Date: October 16, 2018Minute Order - (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...)
Date: October 16, 2018Answer - Answer to Complaint
Date: November 09, 2018Answer
Date: November 09, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: November 29, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: April 11, 2019Summons
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-09-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Order (Re Ruling)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (to Continue Hearing on Demurrer)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer of Overland Mobil Mart and MV Petroleum Corp.)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Defendant Overland Mobile Mart and MV Petroleum Corp.'s Reply in Support of Demurrer
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint)
Date: November 09, 2018Answer
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: November 29, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.