Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gomez Abel Favela, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Starr Robert L., against Fca Us Llc, represented by Proudfoot Matthew M. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Steven J. Kleifield presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 14, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time429 days |
COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY ;ETC
Date: May 14, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 30, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: May 14, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 27, 2018NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE
Date: September 11, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 29, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 24, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 24, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: July 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: July 02, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: July 17, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF MARISA E. SANCHEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF MARISA E. SANCHEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of 07/02/2019)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 17, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.