Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Herrera Abran, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Starr Robert L. Esq., against Fca Us Llc, represented by Gates O'Doherty Gonter & Guy Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Keosian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management93 days |
Filing DateMay 09, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions582 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time652 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: May 09, 2018COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY . ETC
Date: May 09, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 30, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 31, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: May 31, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: July 16, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 16, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 26, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: August 10, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 10, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES
Date: August 17, 2018NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE
Date: September 05, 2018Notice - NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF 998 OFFER OF COMPROMISE
Date: May 07, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: September 12, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/12/2019
Date: September 12, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF OUTCOME
Date: September 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: December 12, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 20, 2020Minute order entered: 2018-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Notice (of Acceptance of 998 Offer of Compromise)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice ( of outcome)
Date: September 23, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: December 12, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/12/2019)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 20, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.