Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Chen Lili, Chow Jun, Er Piper, Chueh Shu Wu "Sue", Hsu Gloria, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Lee Richard H., Vidro Isabelle R., Wu Wendy Y., against Caesar Global Alliance Inc., Chen Lili, Chow Jun, Er Piper, represented by Kuo Hubert, Setoguchi Jon M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management160 days |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions45 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
PLAINTIFFS' VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) JUDICIAL DISSOLUTION; ETC
Date: May 04, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 21, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: May 07, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 31, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 11, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: June 18, 2018NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT
Date: June 18, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: June 18, 2018DEFENDANT JUN CHOW'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2018DEFENDANT PIPER ER'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2018DEFENDANT LILI CHEN'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 20, 2018Substitution of Attorney -
Date: October 09, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 24, 2018Case Management Order
Date: October 11, 2018Minute Order - (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 11, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Lili Chen in Support of Motion
Date: December 12, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Jon M. Setoguchi in Support of Motion
Date: December 12, 2018Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: December 12, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 12, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: January 04, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 08, 2019Reply - Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 28, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: January 31, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: February 01, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 04, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 04, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: February 04, 2019Separate Statement
Date: February 04, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: March 11, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 11, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 11, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: March 12, 2019Order - RULING: MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: March 12, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: March 20, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING OF CASH IN LIEU OF BOND
Date: March 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 22, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JON M. SETOGUCHI IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRIEF
Date: March 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPRAISER)
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: March 29, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 17, 2019Separate Statement
Date: May 17, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 23, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 23, 2019Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: May 24, 2019Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: May 31, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 31, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SUBPOENAS
Date: July 22, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 07, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 07, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE APPRAISAL PROCESS DEADLINES
Date: August 12, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: August 20, 2019Order - RULING: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2019Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: September 04, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL JACKLE
Date: September 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPRAISER VALUATION)
Date: September 30, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 01, 2019Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: October 08, 2019Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 25, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER C. BERSCHAUER IN SUPPORT
Date: October 25, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 07, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: November 04, 2019Separate Statement
Date: November 08, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 08, 2019Motion to Quash
Date: November 08, 2019Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS’ EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF PIPER ER
Date: December 02, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 02, 2019Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DECLARATION OF PIPER ER RE: SANCTIONS
Date: December 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS TO COURT AND DEFENSE COUNSE...)
Date: December 09, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: December 09, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: December 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPRAISAL)
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 08, 2020Answer
Date: January 27, 2020Objection - OBJECTION BY DEFENDANTS TO APPRAISALS AND FINDINGS
Date: January 30, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUN CHOW IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISALS AND FINDINGS
Date: January 30, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF HENRY LEE IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISALS AND FINDINGS
Date: January 30, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF HUBERT KUO IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO APPRAISALS AND FINDINGS
Date: January 30, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO APPRAISAL REPORTS
Date: January 31, 2020Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: June 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 10, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 13, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 13, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: July 21, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 03, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 03, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO US BANK
Date: August 03, 2020Separate Statement
Date: August 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: August 20, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 20, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: August 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: September 02, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 10, 2020Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: September 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]
Date: September 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; HEARING ON MOTION TO ...)
Date: September 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MOTION ON OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS)
Date: September 28, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: October 06, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 16, 2020Status Report
Date: October 19, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 22, 2020Motion for Sanctions
Date: October 26, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, PURSUANT TO CCP § 128.7
Date: October 26, 2020Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (3RD)
Date: November 09, 2020Status Report
Date: November 09, 2020Status Report
Date: November 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PROCEDURE TO VALUE THE DERIVATIVE CLAIMS)
Date: November 10, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 30, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 16, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO MAINTAIN DESIGNATION OF RECORDS AS 'CONFIDENTIAL'
Date: November 17, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 17, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 17, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 17, 2020Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: November 20, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: November 20, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH
Date: November 20, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 20, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 20, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 02, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 02, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: December 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATES ON MOTI...)
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: December 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION RE DESIGNATION OF DOCUMENTS ...)
Date: December 15, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 16, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 16, 2020Separate Statement
Date: December 16, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: December 16, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 17, 2020Separate Statement
Date: December 17, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 17, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 22, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 22, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 23, 2020Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: December 23, 2020Separate Statement
Date: December 23, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 28, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 28, 2020Separate Statement
Date: December 28, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: December 28, 2020Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH CITIBANK SUBPOENA
Date: December 29, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH FOR PRODUCTION OF JUN CHOW’S JP MO...)
Date: December 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT
Date: December 30, 2020Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL "NOT ENTERED"
Date: January 05, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: May 28, 2021Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Rosendo Gonzalez (Attorney); As to: Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Rosendo Gonzalez (Attorney); As to: Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default; Filed by: Caesar Global Alliance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Peiwen, Esq. Chang (Attorney); As to: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Declaration of Lili Chen in Support of Motion; Filed by: Caesar Global Alliance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Declaration of Jon M. Setoguchi in Support of Motion; Filed by: Caesar Global Alliance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant); Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS JUN CHOW, PIPER ER, AND LILI CHEN'S MO...)
Date: November 21, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 21, 2019Order - RULING: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (COMPLAINT)
Date: November 21, 2019Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS BY DEFENDANTS
Date: February 24, 2020Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS' REPLY ISO OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER ON OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS:)
Date: March 06, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: March 11, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF PIPER ER IN SUPPORT
Date: March 11, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF HUBERT KUO IN SUPPORT
Date: March 11, 2020Separate Statement
Date: March 11, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 18, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/03/2020
Date: April 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 03, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 21, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 15, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 19, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 04, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: June 10, 2020Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Declaration of Paul Jackle; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Complaint); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant); As to: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); As to: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Piper Er (Defendant); As to: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: December 22, 2020Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to Quash; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Protective Order/Motion to Quash; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant); Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Caesar Global Alliance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order:) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mot...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Summons Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Caesar Global Alliance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Lili Chen in Support of Motion) Filed by Caesar Global Alliance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Summons Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Peiwen Chang (Attorney)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex Parte Motion of Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er and Lili Che...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Jon M. Setoguchi in Support of Motion) Filed by Caesar Global Alliance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default Filed by Caesar Global Alliance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Protective Order/Motion to Quash Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Rosendo Gonzalez (Attorney)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Appraiser Valuation)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Caesar Global Alliance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Declaration ( of Paul Jackle) Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appraiser)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mot...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by Caesar Global Alliance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order or in the Alternative,...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint) Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Caesar Global Alliance, Inc., dba Newpor...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Stay of Proceedings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mot...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Procedure to Value the Derivative Claims)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order:)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion re Designation of Documents ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions to Court and Defense Counse...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Quash) Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order:) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Referral to an Informal Discovery Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Cross-Defendant); Gloria Hsu (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Trial and Final Status Confere...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appraisal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Motion to Compel Defendants' Depositions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Motion on Objections to Appraisal Reports)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Stipulation to Continue Hearing Dates on Moti...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other on Objections to Appraisal Reports:)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena) Filed by Jun Chow (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ("NOT ENTERED") Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash for Production of Jun Chow?s JP Mo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lili Chen (Defendant); Jun Chow (Defendant); Piper Er (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Shu Wu "Sue" Chueh (Plaintiff); Gloria Hsu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Jon M. Setoguchi in Support of Motion)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Protective Order/Motion to Quash
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Stay Proceedings and Appoint Appraiser)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Protective Order - S. Chueh Declaration)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motions for Protective Order - T. Tso Declaration)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex Parte Motion of Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er and Lili Che...))
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mot...))
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Piper Er In Support of Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Motion)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice (Of Posting of Cash In Lieu of Bond)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Jun Chow In Support of Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Motion)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Hubert Kuo In Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Lili Chen In Support of Defendants' Motion for Stay)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Piper Er In Support of Defendants' Motion for Stay)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Lili Chen In Support of Defendants' Reply Brief to Plaintiffs' Opposition)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Protective Order - H. Pai Declaration)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mot...))
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Lili Chen In Support of Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Motion)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue Motion to Set Aside Default hearing)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Lili Chen in Support of Motion)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Declaration ( of Henry Lee In Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Jun Chow In Support of Defendants' Motion for Stay)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Jon M. Setoguchi in Support of Reply Brief)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motions for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Hubert Kuo In Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING OF CASH IN LIEU OF BOND)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appraiser))
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order:) of )
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff/Cross-Defendants' Separate Statement in Dispute re Bank of the West)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:001st Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Ruling: (1)-(7) Motions for Protective Order or, in Alternative, to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Mabel Hayek, CSR #11815))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:001st Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Objection (to Appraisal Reports)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Caesar Global Alliance, Inc., dba Newpor...))
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion For Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF JENNIFER C. BERSCHAUER IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ( and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re: Subpoenas)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Declaration ( of H. Han Pai in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS- Exhibits 1-10)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Response (PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE TO DECLARATION OF PIPER ER RE: SANCTIONS)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Declaration ( of Paul Jackle)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE TO DECLARATION OF PIPER ER RE: SANCTIONS)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mot...))
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mo...))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Objections to Appraisal Reports)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff/Cross-Defendants' Separate Statement in Dispute re US Bank)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Defendant Jun Chow In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Motions to Quash)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA re DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, PURSUANT TO CCP ¿ 128.7)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS? SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Henry Lee In Support of Objections to Appraisals and Findings)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appraisal))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel (DEPOSITIONS; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...) of )
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Referral to an Informal Discovery Conference) of )
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS - Exhibits 11-12)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Jun Chow In Support of Objections to Appraisals and Findings)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS - Exhibit 13)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Conditional Settlement)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF SHU WU CHUEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice (OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Referral to an Informal Discovery Conference))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Trial and Final Status Confere...))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena Directed to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS? DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition re Motion to Quash Subpoenas Directed to Bank of the West)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena Directed to US Bank)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Response ( to Defendants' Objections to Appraisals)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFFS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF PIPER ER)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Hubert Kuo In Support of Objection to Appraisals and Findings)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Response (to Plaintiffs' Objections to Appraisal Reports by Defendants)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other on Objections to Appraisal Reports:))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Hubert Kuo in Support)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order:))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Objection (by Defendants to Appraisals and Findings)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion to Maintain Designation of Records as 'Confidential')
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS? SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Buford James, CSR #9296))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO MAINTAIN CONFIDENTIALITY AND SEAL RECORDS)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of )
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Felipe Carrillo, CSR #9555))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...) of )
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff/Cross-Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Quash Citibank Subpoena)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Stipulation to Continue Hearing Dates on Moti...))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Motion on Objections to Appraisal Reports))
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Stipulation to Continue Hearing Dates on Moti...) of )
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff/Cross-Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Quash Bank of America Subpoena)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Declaration (Statement of Identification of Discovery Disputes)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Quash (DECEMBER 3, 2020 BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO TD AMERITRADE, INC.)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Appraiser Valuation))
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Declaration ( of R. Lee In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS - Exhibit 14)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Declaration ( of Hubert Kuo In Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to ...))
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Wendy Wu in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Order (Re: Appointment of Appraisers Pursuant to Cal. Corp. Code ¿2000)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order or in the Alternative,...))
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Addresses [CRC 2.251])
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation re Appraisal Process Deadlines)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions to Court and Defense Counse...))
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Procedure to Value the Derivative Claims))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS? OBJECTION TO APPRAISAL REPORTS)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Trial and Final Status Confere...) of )
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (DEFENDANTS? DEPOSITIONS; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT BY JUN CHOW, PIPER ER, AND LILI CHEN)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ("NOT ENTERED")
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Hubert Kuo in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Depositions)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (OF HUBERT KUO REGARDING SERVICE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO CCP ¿ 128.7)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash for Production of Jun Chow?s JP Mo...))
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion re Designation of Documents ...))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER RE: REFERRAL TO AN INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF SHU WU CHUEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS? DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00STIPULATION TO RELEASE CASH BOND AND ORDER
Date: November 17, 2021Declaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Piper Er in Support)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP ¿ 128.7)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Motion on Objections to Appraisal Reports) of )
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (REGARDING BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENAS AND DEPOSITIONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Motion to Compel Defendants' Depositions))
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Declaration ([Joint] Statement Regarding Motions Set for Hearing on September 23/2020)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Motion to Compel Defendants' Depositions) of )
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Lili Chen in Support of Motion)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Jon M. Setoguchi in Support of Motion)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex Parte Motion of Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er and Lili Che...))
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Lili Chen In Support of Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Motion)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Jun Chow In Support of Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Motion)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Piper Er In Support of Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Motion)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mot...))
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Jun Chow In Support of Defendants' Motion for Stay)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Piper Er In Support of Defendants' Motion for Stay)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Lili Chen In Support of Defendants' Motion for Stay)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Stay Proceedings and Appoint Appraiser)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Lili Chen In Support of Defendants' Reply Brief to Plaintiffs' Opposition)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Hubert Kuo In Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mot...))
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Jon M. Setoguchi in Support of Reply Brief)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice (Of Posting of Cash In Lieu of Bond)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING OF CASH IN LIEU OF BOND)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue Motion to Set Aside Default hearing)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appraiser))
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Protective Order - H. Pai Declaration)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motions for Protective Order - T. Tso Declaration)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motions for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Protective Order - S. Chueh Declaration)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Hubert Kuo In Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Caesar Global Alliance, Inc., dba Newpor...))
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order or in the Alternative,...))
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Order (Re: Appointment of Appraisers Pursuant to Cal. Corp. Code ¿2000)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ( and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re: Subpoenas)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Hubert Kuo In Support of Objection to Appraisals and Findings)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Objection (by Defendants to Appraisals and Findings)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Jun Chow In Support of Objections to Appraisals and Findings)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Henry Lee In Support of Objections to Appraisals and Findings)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Objection (to Appraisal Reports)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS- Exhibits 1-10)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS - Exhibit 13)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order:) of 02/06/2020)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Motions to Quash)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS - Exhibits 11-12)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO APPRAISAL REPORTS - Exhibit 14)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order:))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Response (to Plaintiffs' Objections to Appraisal Reports by Defendants)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Response ( to Defendants' Objections to Appraisals)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS? OBJECTION TO APPRAISAL REPORTS)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Objections to Appraisal Reports)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other on Objections to Appraisal Reports:))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Hubert Kuo in Support)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Piper Er in Support)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/03/2020)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/19/2020)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF SHU WU CHUEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS? DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel (DEFENDANTS? DEPOSITIONS; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Motion to Compel Defendants' Depositions) of 06/16/2020)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Motion to Compel Defendants' Depositions))
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS? DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF SHU WU CHUEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel (DEPOSITIONS; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT BY JUN CHOW, PIPER ER, AND LILI CHEN)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Trial and Final Status Confere...))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena Directed to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition re Motion to Quash Subpoenas Directed to Bank of the West)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff/Cross-Defendants' Separate Statement in Dispute re Bank of the West)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena Directed to US Bank)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff/Cross-Defendants' Separate Statement in Dispute re US Bank)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Hubert Kuo in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Depositions)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Referral to an Informal Discovery Conference))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER RE: REFERRAL TO AN INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice (OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Declaration (Statement of Identification of Discovery Disputes)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Declaration ([Joint] Statement Regarding Motions Set for Hearing on September 23/2020)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Mabel Hayek, CSR #11815))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Motion on Objections to Appraisal Reports) of 09/28/2020)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Motion on Objections to Appraisal Reports))
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of 10/06/2020)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Felipe Carrillo, CSR #9555))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (REGARDING BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENAS AND DEPOSITIONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS? SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (OF HUBERT KUO REGARDING SERVICE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO CCP ¿ 128.7)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA re DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, PURSUANT TO CCP ¿ 128.7)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS? SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Buford James, CSR #9296))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Procedure to Value the Derivative Claims))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion to Maintain Designation of Records as 'Confidential')
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP ¿ 128.7)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Defendant Jun Chow In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff/Cross-Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Quash Bank of America Subpoena)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash (DECEMBER 3, 2020 BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO TD AMERITRADE, INC.)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Conditional Settlement)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff/Cross-Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Quash Citibank Subpoena)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash for Production of Jun Chow?s JP Mo...))
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ("NOT ENTERED")
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion For Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Declaration ( of R. Lee In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Declaration ( of Henry Lee In Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation re Appraisal Process Deadlines)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Declaration ( of Hubert Kuo In Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mot...))
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Declaration ( of Paul Jackle)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Appraiser Valuation))
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Declaration ( of H. Han Pai in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF JENNIFER C. BERSCHAUER IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Wendy Wu in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to ...))
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Jun Chow, Piper Er, and Lili Chen's Mo...))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Addresses [CRC 2.251])
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFFS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF PIPER ER)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF H. HAN PAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE TO DECLARATION OF PIPER ER RE: SANCTIONS)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Response (PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE TO DECLARATION OF PIPER ER RE: SANCTIONS)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions to Court and Defense Counse...))
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appraisal))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO MAINTAIN CONFIDENTIALITY AND SEAL RECORDS)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Stipulation to Continue Hearing Dates on Moti...))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion re Designation of Documents ...))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:001st Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.