Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Be Tru Organics Inc., Gordon Keith, Halpern Brad, Wilson-Gordon Julie, Entin Sean, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Beitchman David Prisyon, Kochav Shani, Tokar Paul, against Ady Law Group Pc, Beitchman & Zekian A Profeesional Law Corporation, Be Tru Organics Inc., Gordon Keith, Halpern Brad, (total of 9) See All represented by Austin Gina M, Leetham Tamara Marie, Youssefyeh Afshin David, Youssefyeh Liza Parnassi, Glassman A.J., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management287 days |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions287 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD HALPERN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC
Date: May 04, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: May 04, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)
Date: May 08, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 14, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 14, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 16, 2018NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: May 31, 2018NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER
Date: May 24, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 26, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 11, 2018NOTICE OF RULING RE: JULY 26, 2O18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 27, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE
Date: July 30, 2018DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, ETC
Date: July 30, 2018DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, ETC
Date: July 30, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 03, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2018NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 05, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: September 12, 2018NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: September 12, 2018DEFENDANT ISODIOL INTERNATIONAL INC?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: September 27, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 21, 2018Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: November 26, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 21, 2018Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order to Consolidate Demurrer Hearings
Date: November 30, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 03, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: December 07, 2018Notice - Notice of case reassignment
Date: December 14, 2018Notice of Consolidation - Notice Re: Consolidation of Demurrer Hearings
Date: December 14, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 14, 2018Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 21, 2018Reply - Reply Reply to Opposition to Demurrer
Date: February 08, 2019Reply - Reply Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike
Date: February 08, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS BE TRU ORGANICS, INC., KEITH GORDON, J...)
Date: February 15, 2019Order - Order re: Defendants' Demurrer to and Motion to Strike the Complaint
Date: February 15, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 15, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: February 19, 2019Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: February 20, 2019Separate Statement
Date: February 25, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: February 25, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 01, 2019Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint
Date: March 01, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 08, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF DAVID BEITCHMAN
Date: March 11, 2019Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF SEAN ENTIN
Date: March 08, 2019Order - ORDER RE MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL
Date: March 14, 2019Case Management Order
Date: March 14, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 14, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: March 25, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: April 05, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 15, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: April 15, 2019Answer
Date: May 14, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 28, 2019Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: May 28, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 28, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME
Date: June 06, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 06, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF SEAN ENTIN
Date: June 10, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME)
Date: June 07, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF PAUL TOKAR
Date: June 10, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF BART BAGGETT
Date: June 10, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME
Date: June 10, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. PHILLIPS IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 10, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF A. DAVID YOUSSEFYEH IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 10, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEITH GORDON IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 10, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO ANTI-SLAPP MOTION (SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: June 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME)
Date: June 11, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 12, 2019Reply - REPLY RE OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 12, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME
Date: June 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME)
Date: June 17, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: June 18, 2019Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 19, 2019Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 19, 2019Reply - REPLY RE OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE
Date: June 19, 2019Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: June 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME)
Date: June 19, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF RULING
Date: June 26, 2019Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF SEAN ENTIN
Date: June 27, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO FIRST DECLARATION OF BART BAGGETT
Date: June 27, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF PAUL TOKAR
Date: June 27, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: July 29, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 06, 2019Motion to Compel Arbitration - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY THE ACTION
Date: August 13, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 13, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF BETH CHRISMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: August 13, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JULIE WILSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: August 13, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF BETH CHRISMAN IN SUPPORT OF SURREPLY
Date: August 15, 2019Reply - REPLY SURREPLY TO ANTI-SLAPP MOTION
Date: August 15, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 20, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE SURREPLY
Date: August 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE SURREPLY)
Date: August 29, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 30, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: September 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 06, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO SECOND DECLARATION OF BART BAGGETT
Date: September 06, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO FIRST DECLARATION OF BART BAGGETT
Date: September 06, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF PAUL TOKAR
Date: September 06, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 06, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BETH CHRISMAN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY
Date: September 06, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATTA RE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: September 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)
Date: September 13, 2019Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: September 20, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 20, 2019Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: September 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: October 23, 2019Order - ORDER DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY THE ACTION
Date: October 23, 2019Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: November 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)
Date: November 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRI...)
Date: November 05, 2019Notice - NOTICE RE: NOVEMBER 5, 2019 HEARING
Date: November 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: November 21, 2019Appellate Order Extension of Time - APPELLATE ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME NOA:11/01/19 B302346
Date: November 21, 2019Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: January 17, 2020Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: February 06, 2020Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: February 03, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 18, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 19, 2020Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - APPEAL - NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE NOA 11/1/19 B302346
Date: February 21, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 24, 2020Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "RESP"
Date: June 23, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)
Date: September 01, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: SEPTEMBER 1, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: May 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)
Date: June 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: JUNE 1, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 01, 2021Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF AND CROSS- DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO RE- CALENDAR PENDING MOTIONS
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: July 08, 2021Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: July 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)
Date: July 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE RE AUGUST 25, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF REPRESENTATION OF BE TRU OR...)
Date: September 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)
Date: November 01, 2021Order - ORDER RE: SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT SEAN ENTIN
Date: November 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-SETTLEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 22, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: September 02, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 02, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 02, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: February 06, 2023Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: February 06, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: February 07, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR ON TO...)
Date: February 08, 2023Complaint
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (COMPLT; MEMO OF PTS & AUTHO)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Consolidate Demurrer Hearings)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Consolidation of Demurrer Hearings
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Notice of case reassignment
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS BE TRU ORGANICS, INC., KEITH GORDON, J...))
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Order (re: Defendants' Demurrer to and Motion to Strike the Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Declaration of Sean Entin)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Objection ( to Declaration of David Beitchman)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Order (Re Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time))
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Declaration ( of A. David Youssefyeh in Opposition)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Keith Gordon in Opposition)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Sean Entin)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert J. Phillips in Opposition)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Bart Baggett)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Objection ( to Declaration of Paul Tokar)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Opposition ( to Anti-SLAPP Motion (Special Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time))
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Reply ( re Opposition to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time))
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Objection - OBJECTION TO SECOND DECLARATION OF BART BAGGETT
Date: June 27, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 27, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: July 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: July 08, 2019Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY THE ACTION
Date: July 08, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF FILING SIGNATURES
Date: July 08, 2019Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Reply ( re Opposition to Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Order (Order re Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Declaration ( of Robert J. Phillips)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice ( of Ruling)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Declaration of Sean Entin)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Objection (to First Declaration of Bart Baggett)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Objection ( to Second Declaration of Bart Baggett)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Brad Halpern)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Reply (re Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Declaration ( of Julie Wilson- Gordon)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging ( Unredacated Version of Reply)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Paul Tokar)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Filing Proof of Service re Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice ( of Filing Signatures)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY THE ACTION)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: status of plaintiff's motions))
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to File SurReply))
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to File SurReply)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Objection ( to First Declaration of Bart Baggett)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Paul Tokar)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Reply ( to Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Objection (to Second Declaration of Bart Baggett)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Beth Chrisman in Support of Reply)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice ( of Erratta re Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Brief (Supplemental Brief of Defendants in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Brief (Defendants' Reply Brief re Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application t...))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Order (DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY THE ACTION)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice (RE: HEARING ON PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT SEAN ENTIN?S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Special Motion to Stri...))
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:11/1/19)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice ( RE: NOVEMBER 5, 2019 HEARING)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time (NOA:11/01/19 B302346)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time (NOA:11/01/19 B302346)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Respondent's Ntc Designating Record of Appeal
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal (NOA 11/1/19 B302346)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Default ("RESP")
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Appellate Order Granting Relief from Default (NOA: 11/1/19 B302346)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B302346, NOA 11/1/19;)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Appeal))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (11/1/19 B302346)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 6 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 11/1/19)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 11/01/19 B302346)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE RE: JUNE 1, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE RE: SEPTEMBER 1, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B302346)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Appeal))
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Appeal))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFF AND CROSS- DEFENDANT?S REQUEST TO RE- CALENDAR PENDING MOTIONS)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice (RE AUGUST 25, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: status of representation of Be Tru Or...))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Order (RE: SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT SEAN ENTIN)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE RE SEPTEMBER 29, 2021 OSC RE STATUS OF REPRESENTATION OF BE TRU ORGANICS, INC.)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) DEFE...))
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to file proof o...))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT JULIE WILSON-GORDON;)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions...))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE RE JANUARY 28, 2022 HEARING)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (NOTICE RE FEBRUARY 15, 2022 HEARING)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Lien
Date: November 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) DEFE...)
Date: November 16, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: November 17, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: December 01, 2021Answer
Date: December 01, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 13, 2021Answer
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 13, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: December 15, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: December 20, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 20, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: January 12, 2022Answer
Date: January 12, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: January 20, 2022Answer
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 15, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE JANUARY 28, 2022 HEARING
Date: February 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 15, 2022Case Management Order
Date: February 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANT JULIE WILSON-...)
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE RE FEBRUARY 15, 2022 HEARING
Date: February 17, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: July 20, 2022Order - ORDER RE: CROSS-DEFENDANT SEAN ENTIN’S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES
Date: August 04, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: August 09, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 09, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE AUGUST 22, 2022 HEARING
Date: August 22, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: September 07, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 20, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE SEPTEMBER 21, 2022 HEARING
Date: September 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANTS KEITH GORDO...)
Date: September 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE (JT 02/21/2023))
Date: February 01, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Beth Chrisman in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Julie Wilson in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Brad Halpern in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration (and Stay the Action)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Juliana Amaya # 13099)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Reply (SurReply to Anti-SLAPP Motion)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Declaration ( of Beth Chrisman in Support of SurReply)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to set Aside Entry of Default)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (NOA 11/1/19 B302346)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("RESP")
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B302346, NOA 11/1/19;)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.