Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sosa Carlos, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Blakely Sean Michael, Haines Paul Keith, Reese David John, Xu Jamin, against Bakhtiari Auto Corp Dba Subaru Puente Hills, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maren Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaren Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 24, 2018 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Filed by: Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Stipulation for Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance at Status Conference; Filed by: Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Court Order; Filed by: Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; Filed by: Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff); As to: Bakhtiari Auto Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Order Authorizing Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address; Filed by: Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Order Granting Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Other - - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX CASES AND CLASS ACTIONS
Date: May 07, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 07, 2018Other - - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: June 13, 2018Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: October 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 30, 2019Civil Deposit -
Date: April 24, 2018Complaint -
Date: April 24, 2018Summons -
Date: April 24, 2018Other - - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: July 23, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 30, 2018Legacy Document -
Date: September 28, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00
Date: October 03, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 03, 2019Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
Date: October 03, 2019Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: November 05, 2019Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: November 04, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY ...)
Date: December 16, 2019Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2019Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: May 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 11, 2020Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: August 28, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: October 02, 2020Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: October 07, 2020Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT
Date: October 07, 2020Complaint Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00First Amended Class Action Complaint Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Court Order Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Final Report re: Distribution ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Joined Party
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order) Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Stipulation for Continuance Filed by null
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Order (Granting Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Carlos Sosa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Court Order
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00First Amended Class Action Complaint
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Alan Garrido on Behalf of CPT Group, Inc. with Respect to Settlement Administration)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Carlos Sosa in Support of Approval of Class Action Settlement)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement))
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Stipulation for Continuance
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Joint Stipulation to Modify Implementation Schedule for Class Action Settlement; Order
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Order (Granting Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary ...))
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Joint Notice of Settlement and Stipulation to Continue Further Status Conference
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary ...))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.