Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lopez Felix, Rodriguez Luis, Mcbride Kathleen Williams, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Abramson Michael Alan, Kaufman Aryeh L., Mcdaniel James Edward, against Bergh Katherine, Mcbride Kathleen Williams, represented by David A. Tashroudian Esquire, Kolber Richard A., Nicholas Francisco J., Mitilian Armen G., Mitilian Armen Garo, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2018 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Document:Affidavit - misc Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00Declaration Robin Mashal; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid Paid for Kathleen Williams Mcbride; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Trial Brief PLAINTIFFS’; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-16T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE T...))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Declaration (of David Tashroudian)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Motion)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Advance MSJ Hearing Reserv...))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Advance MSJ Hearing Reservation Date)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Declaration ( OF MICHAEL ABRAMSON RE DEFENDANTS NON AGREEMENT RE MEDIATION)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dis...))
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Kathleen ...))
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Reply (Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing On Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial;))
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Motion for Leave (To File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Answers To Deposition Questions, And For Sanctions;)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of David A. Tashroudian re MTC & Sanctions)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions, ...))
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Brief (EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Mandatory Settlement Confer...))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue Trial date)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/15/2020)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Notice (OF VACATING FSC AND JURY TRIAL AND SETTING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF JUDICIAL OFFICER ASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice (OF JUDICIAL OFFICER ASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Tolling of ...))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference) of 09/03/2021)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference) of 08/09/2021)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHAEL ABRAMSON IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination))
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHAEL ABRAMSON IN OPPOSITION TO OSC RE IMPOSITIONS OF MONETARY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Declaration of David Tashroudian; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Reply Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-07T00:00:00Objection to declaration of McBride; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript B323937 NOA 10-03-2022; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Reply to oppositon; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Declaration of Michael Abramson; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-07T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid PAID FOR APP MCBRIDE( CANINO); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Michael Alan Abramson (Attorney)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid Paid for Kathleen Williams Mcbride; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Appellant)
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Felix Lopez (Plaintiff); Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kathleen Williams McBride (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: BC703537 Hearing Date: February 23, 2024 Dept: 39 Felix Lopez, et al. v. Kathleen Williams McBride Case No. BC703537 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award The Court ordered the parties to... | |
December 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Court Should not Set a Deadline for the Arbitration Per Code of Civil Procedure Section 1283.8 |
|
October 13, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Court Should not Set a Deadline for the Arbitration Per Code of Civil Procedure Section 1283.8 scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39 | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 39, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the Court Should not Set a Deadline for the Arbitration Per Code of Civil Procedure Section 1283.8) - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the Court Should not Set a Deadline for the Arbitration Per Code of Civil Procedure Section 1283.8) - Held - Continued Judge: Stephen I. Goorvitch |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Court Should not Set a Deadli...) | |
October 13, 2023 | Hearing | On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Court Should not Set a Deadline for the Arbitration Per Code of Civil Procedure Section 1283.8 scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
August 25, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Court Should not Set a Deadline for the Arbitration Per Code of Civil Procedure Section 1283.8 scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39 | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Court Should not Set a Deadli...) | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 39 Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 39, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the Court Should not Set a Deadline for the Arbitration Per Code of Civil Procedure Section 1283.8) - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the Court Should not Set a Deadline for the Arbitration Per Code of Civil Procedure Section 1283.8) - Held - Continued Judge: Stephen I. Goorvitch |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.