Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Riddick Bertram, St. George George, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rava Alfred Gerard, against Accor Business And Leisure North America Llc, Beverly Blvd Leaseco Llc, Ratushnyak Alex, The Reunion Parties Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Allen White Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2018 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time162 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: April 23, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 07, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 16, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 31, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 26, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 02, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: August 20, 2018Proof of Service - OF SUMMONS
Date: September 06, 2018NOTICE OF SETTLEMENTOF ENTIRE CASE
Date: September 17, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 21, 2018Request for Dismissal -
Date: October 02, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 02, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: September 21, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00
Date: October 01, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.