Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Black Barry, Black Brenda, Black Rodney, Fishman Douglas S., Fishman Jessica H., (total of 8) See All filed a(n) General Securities - Securities case represented by Arndt Aaron Lee, Foley Thomas Gayle Jr, Foley Thomas G. Jr. Esq., against First Financial Tax Group Inc., Kornfeld Barry, Kornfeld Ferne, Shapiro Robert, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory W. Alarcon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management157 days |
Filing DateApril 16, 2018 |
CategorySecurities Litigation Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions325 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Securities |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Ruling re: Defendant's Demurrer; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Document:Affidavit - misc Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: FIRST FINANCIAL TAX GROUP INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: April 19, 2022Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Order continuing demurrer to ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: ROBERT SHAPIRO (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jon H. Freis, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: ROBERT SHAPIRO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Order denying Mtn to Dismiss re Forum Non Conveniens; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Order CONTINUING DEMURRER; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Order granting mtn to be relieved; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: ROBERT SHAPIRO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Ferne Kornfeld (Defendant); Barry Kornfeld (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Order granting mtn to be relieved as counsel; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Filed by: Barry Black (Plaintiff); As to: Ferne Kornfeld (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Summons -
Date: April 16, 2018Complaint -
Date: April 16, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -
Date: May 18, 2018Other - - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE
Date: May 21, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 30, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 22, 2018NOTICE OF COURT'S RULING REGARDING NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION
Date: June 08, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Date: June 20, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 19, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 10, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 03, 2018NOTICE OF COURT'S RULING REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Date: July 24, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: August 29, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 05, 2018ORDER APPOINTINCURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 17, 2018NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 20, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 20, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Service
Date: October 12, 2018Declaration - Declaration in Support of Motion to Stay or Dismiss Action
Date: November 08, 2018Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Stay or Dismiss Action on Ground of Inconvenient Forum
Date: November 29, 2018Notice - Notice OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Date: November 30, 2018Order - Order denying Mtn to Dismiss re Forum Non Conveniens
Date: December 11, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Forum Non Conveniens)
Date: December 11, 2018Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens
Date: December 28, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 30, 2019Declaration - Declaration Re: Inability to Comply with Meet & Confer CCP 430.41
Date: January 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: March 07, 2019Notice - Notice OF RESCHEULDING OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 08, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 12, 2019Order - ORDER CONTINUING DEMURRER
Date: May 10, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 26, 2019Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: June 24, 2019Notice - NOTICE UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS
Date: August 19, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: August 28, 2019Order - ORDER CONTINUING DEMURRER TO 10/08/19
Date: August 30, 2019Other - - RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER
Date: October 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: August 30, 2019Answer
Date: October 17, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 24, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: October 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND R...)
Date: November 01, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: November 01, 2019Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: November 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: November 21, 2019Order - ORDER GRANTING MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: November 21, 2019Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: November 25, 2019Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: December 03, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 06, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 06, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: December 06, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: December 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: February 11, 2020Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: February 11, 2020Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: February 13, 2020Order - ORDER GRANTING MTN TO BE RELIEVED
Date: February 11, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: March 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE TO FERNE KORNFELD TO APPEAR AS A WITNESS AT TRIAL
Date: March 11, 2020Notice - NOTICE TO BARRY KORNFELD TO APPEAR AS A WITNESS AT TRIAL
Date: March 11, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 02, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/02/2020
Date: April 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 28, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2020
Date: April 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 19, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: October 20, 2020Status Report
Date: April 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 27, 2021Notice - NOTICE SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: September 01, 2021Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FINAL
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 19, 2021Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: October 21, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Status Conference Statement
Date: April 14, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: April 19, 2022Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff); Brenda Black (Plaintiff); Rodney Black (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by ROBERT SHAPIRO (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Affidavit Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff); Brenda Black (Plaintiff); Rodney Black (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Answer - Amended Answer (1st)
Date: October 16, 2018Motion re: - Motion re: to Stay or Dismiss Action on Ground of Inconvenient Forum
Date: November 08, 2018Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Affidavit Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff); Brenda Black (Plaintiff); Rodney Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Status Confer...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Order (denying Mtn to Dismiss re Forum Non Conveniens) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice (of Telephonic Appearance at Demurrer Hearing) Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Forum Non Conveniens)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Answer ((1st)) Filed by ROBERT SHAPIRO (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Order (CONTINUING DEMURRER) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by ROBERT SHAPIRO (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by FIRST FINANCIAL TAX GROUP INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Ruling re: Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 19, 2022Notice (OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice (SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY) Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Ferne Kornfeld (Defendant); Barry Kornfeld (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice (to Ferne Kornfeld to Appear as a Witness at Trial) Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice (of Trial and Final Status Conference) Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: April 19, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by ROBERT SHAPIRO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Jon Hugh Freis, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to be relieved as counsel) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice (to Barry Kornfeld to Appear as a Witness at Trial) Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to be relieved) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: status of representation for First Fi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Ho El Park (Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice (of Trial and Final Status Conference) Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff); Rodney Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Stay or Dismiss Action on Ground of Inconvenient Forum)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Service)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Stay or Dismiss Action)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion re: (to Stay or Dismiss Action on Ground of Inconvenient Forum)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice (OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Answer ((1st))
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Ho-El Park Re: Motion to Stay or Dismiss Action on Ground of Inconvenient Forum)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice (of Telephonic Appearance at Demurrer Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Time for Defendant's to Respond to First Amended Complaint - granted)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Ruling re: Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEULDING OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Order (continuing demurrer to )
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Order (CONTINUING DEMURRER)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND R...))
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice (Unavailability of Counsel for Defendants)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Order (denying Mtn to Dismiss re Forum Non Conveniens)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling of Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Forum Non Conveniens))
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS (FERNE KORNFELD, BARRY KORNFELD, AND F...))
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (Re: Inability to Comply with Meet & Confer CCP 430.41)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice (OF STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice (RESCHEULDING OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to be relieved as counsel)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Extend Response time to Demurrer and continue demurrer re: FAC)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Status Confer...))
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Reply ( to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to be relieved)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice (SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: status of representation for First Fi...))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice (to Ferne Kornfeld to Appear as a Witness at Trial)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice (of Trial and Final Status Conference)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (to Barry Kornfeld to Appear as a Witness at Trial)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Status Conference Statement (FINAL)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice (of Trial and Final Status Conference)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Answer ((1st))
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Stay or Dismiss Action)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Motion re: (to Stay or Dismiss Action on Ground of Inconvenient Forum)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Stay or Dismiss Action on Ground of Inconvenient Forum)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Notice (OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Ho-El Park Re: Motion to Stay or Dismiss Action on Ground of Inconvenient Forum)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (Re: Inability to Comply with Meet & Confer CCP 430.41)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Order (denying Mtn to Dismiss re Forum Non Conveniens)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Time for Defendant's to Respond to First Amended Complaint - granted)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Forum Non Conveniens))
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Extend Response time to Demurrer and continue demurrer re: FAC)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEULDING OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice (OF STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Order (CONTINUING DEMURRER)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Status Confer...))
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice (RESCHEULDING OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Reply ( to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice (Unavailability of Counsel for Defendants)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Order (continuing demurrer to 10/08/19)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling of Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice (of Telephonic Appearance at Demurrer Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS (FERNE KORNFELD, BARRY KORNFELD, AND F...))
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to be relieved as counsel)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND R...))
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice (to Barry Kornfeld to Appear as a Witness at Trial)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/02/2020)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice (to Ferne Kornfeld to Appear as a Witness at Trial)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice (of Trial and Final Status Conference)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: status of representation for First Fi...))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/28/2020)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice (of Trial and Final Status Conference)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice (SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Status Conference Statement (FINAL)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to be relieved)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Service)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Ho El Park (Attorney)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by Barry Black (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS (FERNE KORNFELD, BARRY KORNFELD, AND F...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Jon Hugh Freis, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by ROBERT SHAPIRO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND R...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Order (continuing demurrer to ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.