Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Acting By Order Of A, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Feuer Michael N. City Attorney, Graeler David Esq., against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Title Or Interest In Or To The Property Described Herein, Chicago Title Company, Cosby Oil Co. C O Alan L. Brodkin & Associates Aka Doe 6, Ebrahimi Mohammad, Fidelity National Title Company, (total of 19) See All represented by Brogan Kevin H. Esq., Nejadpour Fari Bari Esq., Peterson Christopher D., Siegel Kara, Trachtenberg Jordan Esq., (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management383 days |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: April 12, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [LIS PENDENS]
Date: April 12, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: April 12, 2018NOTICE OF DEPOSIT
Date: April 13, 2018SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR APPRAISAL OPINION IN SUPPORT OF DEPOSIT (CCP ? 1255.020(B))
Date: April 16, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 19, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: April 19, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 01, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 02, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 04, 2018DISCLAIMER BY DEFENDANT PRODUCTIVE FINANCE, LLC
Date: July 03, 2018Proof of Publication -
Date: July 25, 2018DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: July 19, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 26, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 30, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 01, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 03, 2018NOTICE OF RULING
Date: August 10, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 09, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 14, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: August 14, 2018NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: August 17, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: August 17, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 21, 2018ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: August 21, 2018ORDER RE; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: August 21, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 31, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 31, 2018Notice - Notice of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: November 01, 2018Application - Application for Fourth Partial withdrawl of deposit
Date: November 28, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 06, 2018Opposition - Khorasani's Opposition to Ebrahimi Motion for Withdrawal of Deposit
Date: December 20, 2018Order - Order re ex parte
Date: December 27, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Defendants Ex parte Application for Entry of Order;)
Date: December 27, 2018Opposition - Opposition re Ex parte
Date: December 27, 2018Order - Order re Motion for Withdrawal of Deposit of Probable Compensation
Date: January 09, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 24, 2019Answer - Answer TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: January 30, 2019Response - Response STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO MOTION RE COSTS AND INTEREST
Date: February 01, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For the Issuance of a Writ of...)
Date: February 07, 2019Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application
Date: February 07, 2019Order - Order Proposed Order
Date: February 07, 2019Objection - Objection OBJECTION TO THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;
Date: February 11, 2019Notice - Notice Notice of writ of assistance
Date: February 11, 2019Notice - Notice Notice of order for writ of assistance
Date: February 11, 2019Order - Order re: for 6th Partial
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order Application to Include Statutory ...)
Date: February 15, 2019Order - Order re: Further Partial Withdrawal
Date: February 15, 2019Notice - Notice of Entry of Separate Orders
Date: February 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT MARCO KHORASANI ...)
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 28, 2019Notice - Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 04, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Related Cases;)
Date: February 28, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: March 19, 2019Brief - BRIEF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST
Date: March 28, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 03, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: April 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 15, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 16, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 16, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: April 30, 2019Certificate - CERTIFICATE AMENDED CERTIFICATION OF TAX INFORMATION
Date: July 16, 2019Application for Withdrawal of Funds on Deposit
Date: July 17, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO VERIFIED APPLICATION
Date: July 23, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT
Date: July 23, 2019Notice of Lien
Date: August 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 19, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ATTORNEYS'EYESONLY DESIGNATIONS
Date: August 21, 2019Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: August 23, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 29, 2019Application for Withdrawal of Funds on Deposit
Date: September 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPLICATION FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF D...)
Date: September 20, 2019Order - Order for Partial Withdrawal of Deposit
Date: September 20, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 04, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 08, 2023Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER FOR SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT LIEN
Date: May 24, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 31, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 31, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 06, 2023Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: June 06, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 06, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO KHORASANI EX PARTE APP FOR WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT
Date: June 07, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 08, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 09, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 09, 2023Order - ORDER ORDER TO CONTINUE MTN FOR ORDER, APPL TO WITHDRAW FUNDS
Date: June 15, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 15, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 20, 2023Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTIONS
Date: June 20, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: June 20, 2023Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: June 22, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 28, 2023Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Document:Order for Publication Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 07, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: May 10, 2018ANSWER OF MARCO KHORASANI AND NICOLE KHORASANI
Date: May 10, 2018NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION FOR ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: May 10, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE RE CERTIFIED MAIL ON INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: May 11, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: May 14, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 16, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 23, 2018REDEMPTION/REMITTANCE NOTICE
Date: May 23, 2018ORDER FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT
Date: May 24, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE RE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DOE NOS. 2 AND 3
Date: May 25, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 24, 2018REVISED ORDER FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWL OF DEPOSIT
Date: June 01, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 01, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN OF DEFENDANT L.R.W. INVESTMENT COMPANY
Date: June 05, 2018APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION
Date: June 06, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: June 07, 2018CERTIFICATION OF TAX INFORMATION
Date: June 11, 2018ORDER FOR PUBLICATION
Date: June 11, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 14, 2018ORDER FOR SECOND PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT
Date: June 14, 2018ORDER FOR THIRD PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT
Date: June 14, 2018NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 19, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL
Date: June 19, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: June 22, 2018DISCLAIMER BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC ENTERPRISE BANK
Date: June 25, 2018NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: June 26, 2018NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 02, 2018Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Khorasani's Opposition to Ebrahimi Motion for Withdrawal of Deposit; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Order re ex parte; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Publication Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order for Fourth Partial Withdrawal of Deposit of Probable Compensation; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Starline Tours of Hollywood, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Disclaimer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Disclaimer Filed by: Attorney for Real Pty in Interest
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Fleet Financing Resources, LLC, a California LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Order re: Further Partial Withdrawal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Michael Luparello (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Minute Order; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Michael Luparello (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: L.R.W. Investment Company (DOE 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Order re: for 6th Partial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Starline Tours of Hollywood, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Brief DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: JEREMY WOLF (Defendant); As to: City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: COSBY OIL, CO., C/O ALAN L. BRODKIN & ASSOCIATES (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Order PROPOSED ORDER; Signed and Filed by: City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: JEREMY WOLF (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES
Date: October 15, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 12, 2020Notice of Lien
Date: April 29, 2020Answer
Date: April 29, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: April 29, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO JEREMY WOLF'S APPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWAL
Date: May 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: March 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER
Date: February 26, 2021Order - ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES
Date: April 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES
Date: April 16, 2021Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD
Date: September 20, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RETURN OF OVERPAYMENT BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD
Date: September 20, 2021Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Lien
Date: January 10, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 02, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: October 04, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/20/2022
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: December 20, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER
Date: December 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Lien
Date: January 18, 2023Notice of Lien
Date: February 01, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID GRAELER RE: WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED
Date: February 27, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2023
Date: March 23, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 23, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: March 23, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION
Date: April 03, 2023Stipulation for Judgment
Date: April 03, 2023Judgment
Date: April 03, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF COMPENSATION PER TERMS OF FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 26, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 03, 2023Minute order entered: 2018-06-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Writ of Assistance Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by L.R.W. Investment Company (DOE 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Answer (TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN) Filed by Starline Tours of Hollywood, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by Khorasani, Marco Naser, Trustee of the Kh (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Disclaimer Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Notice Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Los Angeles County Tax Collector (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Defendants Ex parte Application for Entry of Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order) Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Disclaimer Filed by Chicago Title Company (Defendant); Fidelity National Title Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Withdrawal of Deposit of Probable Compensation) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by VIP Tours of California, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Mohammand Ebrahimi, Ex parte Application to include...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For the Issuance of a Writ of...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice Filed by Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Declaration Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Notice Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by L.R.W. Investment Company (DOE 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Disclaimer Filed by Real Party in Interest
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Order (re: for 6th Partial) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Order (re: Further Partial Withdrawal) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Objection (to Verified Application) Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Related Cases;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by L.R.W. Investment Company (DOE 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Starline Tours of Hollywood, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant Marco Khorasani ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Lien Filed by Fleet Financing Resources, LLC, a California LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Starline Tours of Hollywood, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Starline Tours of Hollywood, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Brief (DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST) Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by JEREMY WOLF (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Of Defendants Khorasani and V...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Application to Include Statutory ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Lien Filed by JEREMY WOLF (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Application for Partial Withdrawal of D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by JEREMY WOLF (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Cases;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by FRANCHISE TAX BOARD OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Application for Withdrawal/Object...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Lien Filed by Michael Luparello (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Lien Filed by L.R.W. Investment Company (DOE 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATI...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order) Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Lien Filed by Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: May 19, 2020Request for Refund / Order
Date: June 17, 2020Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED PRE TRIAL DEADLINES
Date: July 02, 2020Notice of Lien
Date: July 14, 2020Notice of Lien
Date: August 18, 2020Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR
Date: October 15, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: February 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: APPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWAL/OBJECT...)
Date: February 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: February 24, 2021Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: L.R.W. Investment Company (DOE 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Order re Motion for Withdrawal of Deposit of Probable Compensation; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by: Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Related Cases;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Application for Fourth Partial withdrawl of deposit; Filed by: Type: Without a Hearing
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Answer TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN; Filed by: Starline Tours of Hollywood, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Opposition re Ex parte; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Minute Order; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: JEREMY WOLF (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Starline Tours of Hollywood, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Disclaimer Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application entry of order o the verified application for fourth partial withdrawl; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Disclaimer Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Objection to Verified Application; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Lien Filed by Michael Luparello (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order) Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER) Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Lien Filed by COSBY OIL, CO., C/O ALAN L. BRODKIN & ASSOCIATES (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Disclaimer
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Application
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Disclaimer
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Disclaimer
Date: 2018-07-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Disclaimer
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Disclaimer (OF INTEREST BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Motion for an Order Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Los Angeles County Tax Collector (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other FOR VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR WITHDR...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Disclaimer Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Application Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Receipt Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Complaint Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Order (re ex parte) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of writ of assistance) Filed by City of Los Angeles, acting by order of a (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by Mohammad Ebrahimi (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Order (re ex parte)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Motion for Order (for Withdrawal of Deposit of Probable Compensation)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Defendants Ex parte Application for Entry of Order;))
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Withdrawal of Deposit of Probable Compensation)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other FOR VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR WITHDR...))
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Include interest on this Court's previous Order of 1-9-19)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Mohammand Ebrahimi, Ex parte Application to include...))
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Response (STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO MOTION RE COSTS AND INTEREST)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Answer (TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Motion (Defendant Mohammad Ebrahim to Include Costs and Statutory Interest on Previous Order)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for the Issuance of a Writ of Assistance)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of order for writ of assistance)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Writ of Assistance
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For the Issuance of a Writ of...))
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Order (re: Further Partial Withdrawal)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Application to Include Statutory ...))
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of writ of assistance)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTION TO THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Order (re: for 6th Partial)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Related Cases;) of 02/28/2019)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Separate Orders)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Cases;))
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice (DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Brief (DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Certificate (Amended Certification of Tax Information)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application t...))
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Objection (to Verified Application)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Application for Withdrawal of Funds on Deposit
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice (of Verified Application for Partial Withdrawal of Deposit)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Objection (by Starline to Khorasani's Verified Application for Partial Withdrawal of Deposit)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (FOR ATTORNEYS'EYESONLY DESIGNATIONS)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Order (for Partial Withdrawal of Deposit)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Application for Withdrawal of Funds on Deposit
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Application for Partial Withdrawal of D...))
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Of Defendants Khorasani and V...))
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance Of Trial And All related Dates)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice (OF RIGHT TO OBJECT TO DEFENDANT JEREMY WOLF?S VERIFIED APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Disclaimer (OF INTEREST ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (NOTICE OF AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Continuing Trial And Related Pre Trial Deadlines)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/03/2021)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/24/2021)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Application for Withdrawal/Object...))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation To Continue Trial And Related Pre Trial Deadlines)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Objection (of Defendant Insurance Company of the West to Jerome Wolf Verified Application)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Order Continuing Trial and Related Pre-Trial Deadlines)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Order (Order Granting California Franchise Tax Board's Application for Withdrawal of Funds on Deposit)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Objection (TO JEREMY WOLF'S APPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWAL)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (of David Graeler (Provided at Court?s Direction) Re: Mediation Date)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Order (CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Return of Overpayment by Defendant California Franchise Tax Board)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.