Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pasquini Brendan, Pasquini Guy, Pasquini Jill, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Doland Michael Charles Esq., against Pasquini Ambrose, Pasquini Family Trust, Pasquini Imports Inc, represented by Samini Babak Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateApril 12, 2018 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time292 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: April 12, 2018VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR 1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY ;ETC
Date: April 12, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 18, 2018NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: June 25, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: July 27, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: July 27, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 03, 2018NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: August 03, 2018NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE
Date: September 19, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: September 19, 2018Minute Order - (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Related Case -
Date: October 12, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 02, 2018Opposition - Opposition to Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 05, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Case Management Confe...)
Date: November 14, 2018Order - RULING
Date: November 14, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order on Notice of Related Cases Re: Pasquini, et al. v...)
Date: December 06, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 06, 2018Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling on Notice of Related Case
Date: December 18, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)
Date: December 20, 2018Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: December 27, 2018Notice - Notice notice of withdrawal of motion
Date: January 03, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: January 29, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order on Notice of Related Cases Re: Pasquini, et al. v...))
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Case Management Confe...))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Notice of Related Case)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00RULING
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice (notice of withdrawal of motion)
Date: January 03, 2019Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: January 29, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.