Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Braun Maria, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Braun Michael Scott, against Caregiving Right Choice, Omni Home Health Inc., The Doctors Choice Agency Doe 1, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Deirdre Hill presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 12, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Within 60 Days Of Judicial Arbitration |
Case Cycle Time340 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: April 12, 2018COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: April 12, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 07, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 03, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: July 06, 2018Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: July 06, 2018NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: July 06, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: July 13, 2018Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: February 22, 2019Order - Order Re Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to Independent Calendar Court
Date: February 26, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case t...)
Date: February 27, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 27, 2019Notice - Notice Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: March 06, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: rescheduling of hearings)
Date: February 28, 2019Notice - Notice Notice of Settlement
Date: March 06, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: March 18, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: June 18, 2019Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Maria Braun (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment) Filed by Maria Braun (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: rescheduling of hearings) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Maria Braun (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Order (Re Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to Independent Calendar Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Receipt Filed by OMNI HOME HEALTH INC. (Defendant); The Doctors Choice Agency (DOE 1) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Maria Braun (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by OMNI HOME HEALTH INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Summons Filed by OMNI HOME HEALTH INC. (Defendant); The Doctors Choice Agency (DOE 1) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: rescheduling of hearings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by OMNI HOME HEALTH INC. (Defendant); The Doctors Choice Agency (DOE 1) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re: rescheduling of hearings) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Maria Braun (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: OMNI HOME HEALTH INC. (Defendant); As to: Roes 1-10 (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Maria Braun (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Braun (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Maria Braun (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Braun (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Maria Braun (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by OMNI HOME HEALTH INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Settlement) Filed by Maria Braun (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Maria Braun (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Settlement)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: rescheduling of hearings))
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case t...))
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: June 18, 2019Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Order (Re Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to Independent Calendar Court)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re: rescheduling of hearings) of 02/28/2019)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.