Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hovorka James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Balady Michelle, Kruger Jackie Rose, Yu Katrina, against Dikijian Khajag, Dikijian Nyrie Salri, represented by Hubert Andrew C., Macdonald Scott Lee, Leos Rory Daniel, Tingen Elizabeth C., Tingen Elizabeth Connor, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 11, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions195 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Opposition to defendants' demurrer and motion to strike; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff); Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Joint List Of Jury Instructions; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff); Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions GIVEN - 16 Pages; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff); Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (as to Judge Moloney, SS 4 - OTR on at 9 am)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice (Of Deposit Of First Appearance Fees On Behalf Of Defendant Nyrie Salri Dikijian)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer to plaintiff's complaint and Motion to St...))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Responses to Plaintiff's Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice (of Errata RE: Ex-Parte Application for an order to Continue Deposition of James Hovorka)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF DEPOSITION)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Demurrer and Motion To Strike)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Notice (Of Unavailability Of Counsel)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order of minute order;))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Order (Re: Demurrer & Motion to Strike to Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Responses to Plaintiff's Form Interrogatories and Request for Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (to defendants' demurrer and motion to strike)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Deposition)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Opposition (Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's EX parte)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata for Ruling on MTQ Subpoena)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel further responses of Deposition o...))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Nyrie Salri Kikijian and Khalag Kikikian's Motion f...))
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Compel to Set Two of Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Tria...))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an order to continue motion to compel deposition hearing)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to RPDs)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order advancing and continuing Hearing on Motion to Com...))
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to be Relieved From Deemed Admissions)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Form In...))
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Motion for Order (COMPELLING THE INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order advancing and continuing Hearing on Motion to Com...) of )
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Compel Set two of Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Request for Admissions)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff James Hovorka's Ex Parte Application for an order t...))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and all related trial dates;)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE 7 TO EXCLUDE TRAFFIC COLLISION REPORT;)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Motion for Order (to Be Relieved from Deemed Admissions)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application, Filed by the Plaintiff, to C...))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE 7 TO EXCLUDE TRAFFIC COLLISION REPORT;)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendants, Nyrie Salri Dikijian and ...))
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Nyrie Salri Kikijian's Motion for Order To Be Relie...))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Further orders on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Supb...) of )
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Continuing Trial and All Related Trial Date)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF TAX RETURNS;)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Order Compelling the Independent Medical Exam)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Reply (Def Declaration and Reply to Pltf Oppo re MTC SPRogs & RFP Set 2)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE REPTILE THEORY ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further orders on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Supb...))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to ...))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendants Salri Dikijian and Khlag Dikijian to Com...))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF RORY D. LEOS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE REPTILE THEORY ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Joint List Of Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Affidavit (Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions ag...) of )
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions (GIVEN - 37 Pages)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions (GIVEN - 16 Pages)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Judgment])
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment on the Verdict)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order as to Judge Moloney, SS 4 - OTR on at 9 am; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Scott L MacDonald (Attorney)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Order Re: Demurrer & Motion to Strike to Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Objection to Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment on the Verdict; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice Notice of Errata for Ruling on MTQ Subpoena; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application, Filed by the Plaintiff, to C...)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Nyrie Salri Dikijian (Defendant); Khajag Dikijian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Affidavit Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6); Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Wil S. Wilcox, CSR #9178)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE REPTILE THEORY ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Re: Minute Order of ))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Rory D. Leos regarding failure to submit Joint Trial Documents)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions ag...))
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Jury Instructions GIVEN - 37 Pages; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: James Hovorka (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Opposition (to defendants' demurrer and motion to strike)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Demurrer and Motion To Strike)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order of minute order;))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Order (Re: Demurrer & Motion to Strike to Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice (Of Unavailability Of Counsel)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice (of Errata RE: Ex-Parte Application for an order to Continue Deposition of James Hovorka)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Deposition)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Responses to Plaintiff's Form Interrogatories and Request for Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF DEPOSITION)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Responses to Plaintiff's Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an order to continue motion to compel deposition hearing)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Opposition (Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's EX parte)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff James Hovorka's Ex Parte Application for an order t...))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to RPDs)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Compel Set two of Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Request for Admissions)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Compel to Set Two of Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order advancing and continuing Hearing on Motion to Com...))
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Reply (Def Declaration and Reply to Pltf Oppo re MTC SPRogs & RFP Set 2)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel further responses of Deposition o...))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Nyrie Salri Kikijian and Khalag Kikikian's Motion f...))
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendants, Nyrie Salri Dikijian and ...))
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Wil S. Wilcox, CSR #9178)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata for Ruling on MTQ Subpoena)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Motion for Order (to Be Relieved from Deemed Admissions)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application, Filed by the Plaintiff, to C...))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to be Relieved From Deemed Admissions)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Nyrie Salri Kikijian's Motion for Order To Be Relie...))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE 7 TO EXCLUDE TRAFFIC COLLISION REPORT;)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE REPTILE THEORY ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to ...))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE 7 TO EXCLUDE TRAFFIC COLLISION REPORT;)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE REPTILE THEORY ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Re: Minute Order of 10/20/2021 ))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Rory D. Leos regarding failure to submit Joint Trial Documents)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE REPTILE THEORY ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions ag...))
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Affidavit (Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (as to Judge Moloney, SS 4 - OTR on 2/22/22 at 9 am)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice (Of Deposit Of First Appearance Fees On Behalf Of Defendant Nyrie Salri Dikijian)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer to plaintiff's complaint and Motion to St...))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Form In...))
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and all related trial dates;)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Motion for Order (COMPELLING THE INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/10/2020)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Tria...))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Continuing Trial and All Related Trial Date)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Order Compelling the Independent Medical Exam)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF RORY D. LEOS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendants Salri Dikijian and Khlag Dikijian to Com...))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF TAX RETURNS;)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further orders on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Supb...))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Motion for Order (MOTION FOR ORDER TO BE RELIEVED FROM DEEMED ADMISSIONS;)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.