Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Romo-Martinez Ramiro, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alder C. Michael Esq., against Afs Investments Llc Dba Lms Transport A California Corporation, Espana Margara Laritza Miranda, Lmn Incorporated, Valero Refining Company-California, represented by Brinson Katherine J., Garber Marc Howard, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 21, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeConsolidated (Non-Lead Case) |
Case Cycle Time369 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:General Denial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: March 22, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: March 22, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 22, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 02, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 03, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 04, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: April 25, 2018GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY
Date: April 25, 2018Association of Attorney - Association of Counsel
Date: November 07, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases (BC692333 and BC699305))
Date: November 08, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES BC699305 AND BC692333)
Date: March 25, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases (BC692333 and BC699305)))
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Association of Counsel
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Consolidating Cases BC699305 and BC692333))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.