Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ferrer Javvi Joyce, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Khakshooy Bob B. Esq., against Coakley Erin Michelle, Wolf Richie, represented by Trafton Alan P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
NOTICE FO DEPOSIT OF JURY FEE
Date: June 11, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: June 11, 2018NOTICE OP NAME CHANGE
Date: September 11, 2018Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: October 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 14, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: March 10, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 10, 2020Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: October 11, 2019Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: January 14, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.