Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Falcon Marfa, Iskandari Vick, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Berberian Richard, against Sheibani-Rad Shahin E. M.D., represented by Clark Bradley C. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorgina T. Rizk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2018 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJuly 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
SUMMONS -
Date: March 09, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 06, 2018COMPLAINT 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE 2. LOSS OF CONSORTIUM
Date: March 09, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 26, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: July 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: July 29, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: August 06, 2019Separate Statement
Date: August 06, 2019Exhibit List
Date: August 06, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: October 23, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: January 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: February 03, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: March 05, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 09, 2020Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by Shahin E. M.D. Sheibani-Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Shahin E. M.D. Sheibani-Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Marfa Falcon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Vick Iskandari (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Marfa Falcon (Plaintiff); Vick Iskandari (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Marfa Falcon (Plaintiff); Vick Iskandari (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Shahin E. M.D. Sheibani-Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Shahin E. M.D. Sheibani-Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial) Filed by Shahin E. M.D. Sheibani-Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Marfa Falcon (Plaintiff); Vick Iskandari (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Shahin E. M.D. Sheibani-Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Vick Iskandari (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shahin E. M.D. Sheibani-Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Shahin E. M.D. Sheibani-Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Marfa Falcon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by Shahin E. M.D. Sheibani-Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by Shahin E. M.D. Sheibani-Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 02/03/2020)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice (of Taking off Calendar Defendant Shahin E. Sheibani-Rad, M.D.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.