Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jenkins Cathy, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Gupta Ruchika Emmanuel Esq., against Bj'S Restaurans Inc., represented by Gobel Sevan, Nicolaisen Kelsey Laurel Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Separate Statement; Filed by: Cathy Jenkins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Cathy Jenkins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: BJ's Restaurans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Cathy Jenkins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by:
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Cathy Jenkins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: BJ's Restaurans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF JEFFREY TSAO; Filed by: BJ's Restaurans, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Cathy Jenkins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: March 06, 2018COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY: 1. NEGLIGENCE
Date: March 06, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 05, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND WITHDRAWAL OF REPRESENTING ATTORNEY
Date: April 19, 2018ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT;DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: April 30, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: May 03, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: May 03, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))
Date: January 22, 2019Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: January 22, 2019Motion to Quash
Date: February 27, 2019Separate Statement
Date: February 27, 2019Motion to Quash
Date: February 28, 2019Separate Statement
Date: February 28, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 17, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEFFREY TSAO
Date: May 17, 2019Separate Statement
Date: May 17, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 29, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION TO CON...)
Date: December 10, 2019Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: January 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: January 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)
Date: March 24, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: March 31, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING OSC
Date: April 13, 2020Complaint
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order- Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoen...))
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposi...))
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court's Ruling On Submitted Matter Re: Plaintiff's Motion to...))
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JEFFREY TSAO)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application and Motion to Continue Defend...))
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application and Motion to Con...))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application and Motion to Con...))
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00BJ?S? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DELAY HEARING OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 03/24/2020)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement ((Unconditional))
Date: 2020-03-31T00:00:00Notice (of Court Ruling on Ex Parte to Continue MSJ Hearing Date and All Related Dates)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Settlement; The matter is ...))
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;))
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION))
Date: June 12, 2020in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing OSC)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.