Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Channel Island Roofing Inc., Merit Metal Products Inc., Roofing & Waterproofing Forensics Doe 1, Viewpoint Educational Foundation A California Nonprofit Corporation, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Channel Island Roofing Inc., Hmh Construction Co. Inc., Jeffrey M. Kalban & Associates Architecture Incorporated A California Corporation, Roofing & Waterproofing Forensics Doe 1, represented by Barger Glenn T. Esq., Choi Peter Jin Young, Enright Madelyn Alberta, Sedach Steven W., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Lia Martin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: March 29, 2018NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: March 29, 2018CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: March 29, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 02, 2018MERIT METAL PRODUCTS, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 02, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: April 02, 2018MERIT METAL PRODUCTS, INC?S CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: April 02, 2018HMH CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: April 04, 2018SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: April 11, 2018NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: May 07, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 10, 2018ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: May 15, 2018NOTICE OF PO8TING JURY FEES
Date: May 15, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: May 15, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: May 25, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: May 25, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: May 29, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: May 30, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 01, 2018NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: June 07, 2018ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: June 12, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 26, 2018ASSOCIATIONS OF COUNSEL FOR CHANNEL ISLANDS ROOFING, INC
Date: July 10, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 12, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 17, 2018Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: July 23, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 23, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: July 24, 2018NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 27, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 25, 2018NOTICE AND ORDER OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 30, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS!INCORRECT NAME)
Date: July 31, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 23, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBERS
Date: August 27, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 27, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 28, 2018ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY
Date: August 31, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 29, 2018ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: September 04, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 12, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: September 14, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)
Date: November 14, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: February 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 06, 2019Notice - Notice of Entry of Order
Date: February 27, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference)
Date: February 21, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: March 01, 2019Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint for Damages
Date: March 01, 2019Answer
Date: March 15, 2019Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: March 22, 2019Answer
Date: April 02, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 10, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: May 06, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 03, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: June 06, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: August 15, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 10, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 18, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: October 10, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: October 11, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: October 15, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: November 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 20, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (for Indemnification, Apportionment of Fault, and Declaratory Relief)
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: March 01, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMACES
Date: March 01, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 12, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 05, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 23, 2018SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2018Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: March 29, 2018Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 11, 2019Answer
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 10, 2019Answer (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint for Damages)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 15, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: November 18, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.