Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BARBARA PEREZ VS RICHARD SAUL CONTRERAS CALDERON
On March 01, 2018 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Perez Barbara, against Calderon Richard Saul Contreras, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 01, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 20, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
Case Duration
9 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Georgina T. Rizk |
|
September 03, 2019 | hearing |
in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Georgina T. Rizk |
|
August 15, 2019 | hearing |
in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Georgina T. Rizk |
|
December 14, 2018 | Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing | ||
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing Filed by Clerk |
|
December 11, 2018 | Request for Dismissal | ||
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Barbara Perez (Plaintiff) |
|
March 01, 2018 | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) - | ||
March 01, 2018 | Summons - | ||
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Barbara Perez (Plaintiff) |
|
March 01, 2018 | hearing | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) |