Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Laire Annie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Starr Robert Lorne Esq., against Kia Motors America Inc., represented by Senior Julian Gallus Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Susan Bryant-Deason presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan Bryant-Deason Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time384 days |
COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY ;ETC
Date: February 23, 2018NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER
Date: March 13, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 29, 2018KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; JURY DEMAND
Date: April 03, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: April 16, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: April 16, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: April 18, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: April 18, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 03, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 04, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference)
Date: December 04, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference)
Date: December 07, 2018Notice - Notice of Settlement
Date: January 11, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference ****OFF/CAL,CASE SETTLED***)
Date: February 04, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: March 11, 2019SUMMONS -
Date: February 23, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Notice (of Settlement)
Date: January 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference ****OFF/CAL,CASE SETTLED***))
Date: February 04, 2019Minute Order ((Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 13, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: March 11, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.