Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Benitez Carla, Benitez Margarita, Marguarita Benitez As Successor-In Interest To Decedent Raul Guadalupe Benitez, filed a(n) Toxic,Environmental - Torts case represented by Metzger Raphael, against Axiall Corporation, Does 1 To 250, Ecolab Inc., Ecolink Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, (total of 12) See All represented by Botros Samantha A., Drapalski H Joseph Iii, Gilhuly R. Morgan, Willis Vanessa, Everett Seymour, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeToxic,Environmental |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Joinder to Motion to Continue Trial; Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: United Fabricare Supply, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Ecolab Inc. (doe No. 2) (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ecolab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: Ecolab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Reply Ecolab's Reply to Pltfs' Opposition to MTS; Filed by: Ecolab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to Complaint; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ecolab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Matthew S. O'Brien in Support; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration of Matthew S. O'Brien; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Joinder to Exparte Application; Filed by: Vulcan Materials Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Benitez, Margarita, individually and as (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant); As to: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Benitez, Margarita, individually and as (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Occidental Chemical Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling MADE BY THE COURT ON JANUARY 13, 2020; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Prudential Overall Supply (Claimant)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses and Documents; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Portions of Complaint; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Vulcan Materials Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Declaration In Support Of The Motion; Filed by: The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: Ecolab Inc. (doe No. 2) (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Declaration OF MATTHEW S. O?BRIEN IN SUPPORT; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Vulcan Materials Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Declaration of NAH; Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling CONTINUING HEARING; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Declaration of O'Brien In Support of Motion to Compel; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Vulcan Materials Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Occidental Chemical Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Legacy Vulcan's Motion to Strike; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling RESETTING HEARING; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Memorandum ISO MTS; Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Joinder to Motion TO CONTINUE TRIAL; Filed by: United Fabricare Supply, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Memorandum ISO Demurrer; Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Joinder to Motion to Continue Trial; Filed by: Vulcan Materials Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Opposition To Motion To Compel Further Responses; Filed by: Ecolab Inc. [DOE 2] (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: United Fabricare Supply, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant); PPG Industries (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ecolab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: United Fabricare Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ecolab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Opposition to Axiall's Motion to Strike; Filed by: Benitez, Margarita, individually and as (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: United Fabricare Supply, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Opposition to Axiall's Demurrer; Filed by: Benitez, Margarita, individually and as (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Occidental Chemical Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Vulcan Materials Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: ECOLAB, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Occidental Chemical Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: ECOLAB, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: United Fabricare Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Occidental Chemical Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant); PPG Industries (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ECOLAB, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Vulcan Materials Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: ECOLAB, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: United Fabricare Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL STATEMENT OF DAMAGES
Date: February 26, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: February 26, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: February 26, 2018PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: February 26, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: March 14, 2018NOTICE OF ORDER OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: March 20, 2018NOTICE OF PENDING THIRD PARTY ACTION TO MEDICARE
Date: May 11, 2018NOTICE OF THIRD PARTY ACTION TO MEDI-CAL
Date: May 11, 2018COURT'S RULING
Date: June 08, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 08, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: June 15, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 15, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 26, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 18, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: June 28, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)
Date: October 23, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: October 24, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 22, 2019Notice of Lien
Date: November 08, 2018Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: February 01, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 11, 2019Response - Response to OSC re Proof of Service
Date: February 14, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)
Date: February 20, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: March 04, 2019Answer
Date: March 05, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE TO EMPLOYER OF THIRD PARTY ACTION
Date: April 15, 2019Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: April 15, 2019Answer
Date: April 15, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 20, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO ECOLAB'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 20, 2019Reply - REPLY ECOLAB'S REPLY TO PLTFS' OPPOSITION TO MTS
Date: May 24, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 24, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 30, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF O'BRIEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: April 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. O'BRIEN
Date: April 27, 2020Separate Statement
Date: April 27, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 27, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: May 30, 2019Case Management Order
Date: May 30, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 05, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST
Date: July 01, 2019Answer
Date: August 05, 2019Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: August 02, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 03, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL PRODUCTS IDENTIFIED DURING DISCOVERY
Date: October 17, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: November 04, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 06, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 21, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 02, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: December 02, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. O'BRIEN PURSUANT TO CCP § 430.41 IN SUPPORT
Date: December 12, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 12, 2019Answer
Date: December 12, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 12, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO AXIALL'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: December 24, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO AXIALL'S DEMURRER
Date: December 24, 2019Declaration of Matthew S. O'Brien in Support; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration of Paloma I. Moreno-Acosta; Filed by: ECOLAB, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Request for Copies of Prior Pleadings and Discovery; Filed by: Vulcan Materials Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: ECOLAB, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Ecolink, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: PPG Industries (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant); PPG Industries (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: ECOLAB, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Joinder to Exparte Application; Filed by: Axiall Corporation (Defendant); PPG Industries (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: PPG Industries (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration OF SILVIA C. SCHAFFER; Filed by: United Fabricare Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Carla Benitez (Plaintiff); Margarita Benitez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: January 08, 2020Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: January 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING MADE BY THE COURT ON JANUARY 13, 2020
Date: January 13, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 17, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 17, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 17, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS
Date: January 27, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 27, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 04, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: February 04, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: February 11, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 06, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: April 07, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: April 24, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION
Date: April 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 24, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. O’BRIEN IN SUPPORT
Date: April 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. O'BRIEN IN SUPPORT
Date: April 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 04, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: May 05, 2020Answer
Date: May 07, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 07, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: May 11, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 13, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION
Date: June 05, 2020Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: June 05, 2020Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: June 08, 2020Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: June 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 11, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING CONTINUING HEARING
Date: June 11, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RESETTING HEARING
Date: June 11, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: June 23, 2020Memorandum - MEMORANDUM ISO MTS
Date: July 08, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: July 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF NAH
Date: July 08, 2020Memorandum - MEMORANDUM ISO DEMURRER
Date: July 08, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: July 08, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: July 15, 2020Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: July 10, 2020Joinder - JOINDER TO EXPARTE APPLICATION
Date: July 16, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 21, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: July 28, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 28, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: July 30, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: July 30, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 12, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/12/2020
Date: August 12, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 17, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO LEGACY VULCAN'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: August 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING
Date: August 21, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 28, 2020Answer
Date: August 31, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AME...)
Date: September 08, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF NON RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION
Date: September 10, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2020Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS’ OPPOSITION TO ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2020Request - REQUEST FOR COPIES OF PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY
Date: April 24, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. O'BRIEN IN SUPPORT
Date: April 27, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ECOLINK'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 15, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/15/2020
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: September 17, 2020Request for Refund / Order
Date: September 24, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/09/2020
Date: October 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF COURT ENTERING STIPULATION
Date: October 13, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: October 19, 2020Answer
Date: October 27, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 02, 2020Answer
Date: November 02, 2020Answer
Date: November 09, 2020Answer
Date: November 12, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: November 13, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 20, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: July 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF PALOMA I. MORENO-ACOSTA
Date: August 02, 2021Separate Statement
Date: August 02, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: August 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 02, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 05, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 10, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 22, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 22, 2021Exhibit List
Date: September 22, 2021Separate Statement
Date: October 06, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT
Date: October 06, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 06, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 06, 2021Exhibit List
Date: October 06, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 06, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 18, 2021Separate Statement
Date: October 28, 2021Association of Attorney
Date: October 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET TWO)
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: November 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 06, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/06/2021
Date: December 06, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: December 06, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: December 08, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 22, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 27, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: December 30, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: January 11, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: January 18, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 08, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 08, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 13, 2022Separate Statement
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 29, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 26, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to continue trial)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 20, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 23, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 23, 2020Notice of Motion - AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: November 23, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 01, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 14, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: January 21, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: May 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 18, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: May 20, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: July 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS)
Date: July 27, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 27, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: July 29, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF SILVIA C. SCHAFFER
Date: December 17, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT LEGACY VU...)
Date: December 22, 2021Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion To Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion To Separate Statement In Support Of Motion To Compel)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/12/2020)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Legacy Vulcan's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Hearing)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Reply (in Support of its Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Ame...))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' Opposition to its Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice (OF NON RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Answer (To First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Ecolink's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/15/2020)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Ecolink's Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/09/2020)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Counsel of Records for United Fabricare Supply, Inc.)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Amended Notice of Court Entering Stipulation
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Answer (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike Portion of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue the Trial and All Pre-trial Deadlines)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/18/2021)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Specially Set the Hearing on Its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Specially Set...))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Objection (to the Evidence in Support of Opposition to Def. Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Dismiss) of 07/27/2021)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For Order To Specially Set Hearing On Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Declaration of Angela V. Sayre in Support of Defendant's Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Specially Set the Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or Continue Trial;)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Paloma I. Moreno-Acosta)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order To Specially Set He...))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Special Interrogatories Set Two)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Specially Setting H...))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss) of 07/27/2021])
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Compendium of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (by Defendant Legacy Vulcan, LLC)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Univar Solutions' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Issues
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Errata on Defendant Univar Solutions Index of Exhibits
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Advancing the Hearing on a Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the He...))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Ecolab Inc.'s Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set Two))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/06/2021)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Raphael Metzger, Esq.
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternatively for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgmwent)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Silvia C. Schaffer)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Response (plaintiff's response to order to show cause re: failure to file proof of service)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Response ( to OSC re Proof of Service)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice (to Employer of Third Party Action)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Opposition ( to Ecolab's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Reply (Ecolab's Reply to Pltfs' Opposition to MTS)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice ( of Additional Products Identified During Discovery)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (Portions of Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Matthew S. O'Brien Pursuant to CCP ¿ 430.41 in Support)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Axiall's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Demurrer)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Axiall's Demurrer)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS'IRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's First Ame...))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (MADE BY THE COURT ON JANUARY 13, 2020)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses and Documents)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Richard Morgan)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Authorizing Electronic Service)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Request (for Copies of Prior Pleadings and Discovery)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice (of Application)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Motion for Order (COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Motion for Order (Compelling Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Motion for Order (Compelling Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set One)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Motion for Order (COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Matthew S. O'Brien in Support)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (of O'Brien In Support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00General Denial (and Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 05/05/2020)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/07/2020)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/13/2020)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (In Support Of The Motion)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/11/2020)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Memorandum (ISO Demurrer)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Memorandum (ISO MTS)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Joinder (to Exparte Application)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Joinder (to Exparte Application)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Advance And Hear Dow Chemi...))
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Matthew S. O'Brien in Support)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Matthew S. O'Brien)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF MATTHEW S. O?BRIEN IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/04/2020)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of NAH)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.