Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Di Palma Jycelyn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kaufman Scott R. Esq., against Edmond Genedismissed, Toyota Motor Sales Usa Inc, represented by Beatty Sean D. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara M. Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTIES;ETC
Date: February 23, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: February 23, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 12, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 19, 2018DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: April 02, 2018DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: June 07, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: June 07, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: June 07, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 22, 2018NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY PLAINTIFF JOYCELYN DI PALMA
Date: June 26, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 31, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: June 26, 2018DECLARATION REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: August 27, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 20, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 04, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: September 06, 2018Declaration - DECLARATION OF COURTNEY PERDUE RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: May 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT)
Date: May 22, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: June 25, 2019Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Jycelyn Di Palma (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Declaration of Courtney Perdue re Motions in Limine; Filed by: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Courtney Perdue re Motions in Limine) Filed by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Jycelyn Di Palma (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jycelyn Di Palma (Plaintiff)
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jycelyn Di Palma (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order Continuing Trial...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Jycelyn Di Palma (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Courtney Perdue re Motions in Limine)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Settlement))
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Settlement) of 05/22/2019)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order Continuing Trial...))
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 25, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.