Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hoyt Thomas, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Blumenthal Norman B. Esq., Decker Christopher William, against Travelers Indemnity Company The, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Carolyn B. Kuhl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn B. Kuhl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2018 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
SUMMONS -
Date: February 20, 2018Minute Order - -
Date: March 09, 2018Order - -CLASS ACTION INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER
Date: March 09, 2018Other - - FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR
Date: April 26, 2018Other - - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 30, 2018Other - - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2018Other - - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2018Civil Deposit -
Date: May 11, 2018Other - - BC695351 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Date: May 11, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 15, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 16, 2018Status Report - BC695351 JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT
Date: June 14, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - BC695351
Date: June 14, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 20, 2018Other - - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2018Other - - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR:
Date: July 25, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 25, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 03, 2018Status Report - JOINT REPORT RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION
Date: June 11, 2019Request - JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 27, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2019Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING POST RE CONT 12/10
Date: December 03, 2019Status Report - JOINT REPORT RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION
Date: January 31, 2020Order - Dismissal
Date: February 27, 2020Complaint
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Message Board Posting (post re cont 12/10)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Joint Request to Continue Status Conference
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere - 02/07/2020 10:00 AM Further Status Conference)
Date: February 06, 2020Joint Report RE: Status of Arbitration
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review RE THE STATUS OF ARBITRATION))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Joint Report RE: Status of Arbitration
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: February 27, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.