Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shin Sung Woo, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Shioda Gene Hitoshi, against Kang'S Acupucture Clinic, L.A.C O.M.D., Seon Kang Byeong, represented by Carroll Richard Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2018 |
CategoryOther Professional Health Care Malpractice (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
SUMMONS -
Date: February 13, 2018COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE)
Date: February 13, 2018SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -
Date: October 03, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: May 28, 2019Minute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement))
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 05/28/2019)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 05, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.