Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hale Michael, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Johnson Tisha, represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeresa A. Beaudet Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time185 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: February 05, 2018REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES
Date: February 05, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -
Date: February 05, 2018COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: February 05, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: February 06, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 14, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 01, 2018VERIFIED STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION
Date: May 08, 2018PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL
Date: May 08, 2018ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER
Date: May 14, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 14, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 15, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: May 16, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 04, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 07, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE
Date: June 12, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 14, 2018ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE
Date: July 06, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 06, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE CCP 170.6
Date: July 17, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 18, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE
Date: July 20, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 24, 2018ORDER REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 170.6
Date: July 24, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 24, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 01, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 02, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 08, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 20, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-06-16T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-06-16T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 08, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.