Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
City Of Pasadena, Linda Vista Children'S Center, Merchants Landscape Services Inc, Pasadena City Of, Hasbun Anna, (total of 12) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Glassman Robert Samuel, Hough Joseph David, against Children'S Center, City Of Pasadena A Public Entity, Does 1 To 30, Linda Vista Children'S Center, Merchants Landscape Services Inc, (total of 6) See All represented by Baker Phillip, Buehler Mark Bernard, D'Andrea Katayon, Doumanian Nancy Prapion, Mccune Dana John, (total of 19) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYolanda Orozco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management278 days |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions645 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
VerdictDefendant |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time165 days |
[Proposed] Judgment for Costs
Date: June 10, 2021Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: June 16, 2021Complaint
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: June 28, 2021Application
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Application-Miscellaneous (FOR ADELAIDE ROSE PALMSTROM GUARIDAN AD LITEM )
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT FOR JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Association of Attorneys
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT FOR JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint (BY DFT WEST COAST ARBORISTS PAID FEES ON 04-09-2017 FOR $435)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT SLIP FOR JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Amendment to Cross Complaint (ROE AMENDMENT )
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint (LINDA VISTA CHILDREN'S CENTER )
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Order (MOTION TO TRANSDER PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER )
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00ORDER MOTION TO TRANSFER PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Cross-complaint
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Summons Filed (first amended on cross complaint )
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:001st Amended Cross-Complaint Linda Vista Children's Center
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (Defendant and Cross-Complainant City of Pasadena)
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Acknowledgement of Receipt
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (in City of Pasadena's motion for leave to file cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order re Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Related Cases) of 10/15/2018)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Opposition (to defendants City of Pasadena's motion for leave to file cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to motion for leave to file cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Other - (Court's Order re: Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Answer (to cross-complainant Pasadena Unified School District)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Answer (to City of Pasadena's Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice (of ruling re: motion for leave to file cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Opposition (to plaintiff's motion for preferential trial setting; declaration of Tammy Kim)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference r/w BC705917))
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Opposition (to plaintiff's motion for preferential trial setting)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Answer (to defendant and cross-complainant Pasadena Unified School District's cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of case management conference)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Answer (to defendant and cross-complainant City of Pasadena's Cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Notice (of association of counsel)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Other - (Civil Deposit re: Jury Fees)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference r/w BC705917; Order to Show Cause ...))
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Notice (of association of counsel (amended))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion for an order granting preferential Trial)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Answer)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant City of Pasadena's Ex-Parte Application for an Orde...))
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Pasadena Unified School District's Ex-Parte Applica...))
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Order Granting Preferential Trial Date)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Reply (in support of motion for preferential trial date)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Reply (Defendant City of Pasadena's Reply to Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Court's Order re: Motion for Preferential Trial Setting
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference as to the pleadings and Informal Discovery;...))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Con't of Motion to Reclassify (Hasbun))
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Con't of Motion to Reclassify (Moad))
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Order (Granting Leave to Amend Answer)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Defendant PUSD's MTC Depositions of Palmstrom, Hasbun and Moad)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Court's Order re: Motions to Reclassify
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference as to the pleadings and Informal Discovery;...))
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (and Joinder of Linda Vista Children's Centerin Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice (of Advancement of Hearing Date)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Confidentially and Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For an Order Sealing Declaration of Robert Glassman)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant City of Pasadena's Ex-Parte Application for Orders:...))
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'...))
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Exhibits and Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (and Exhibits in Support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Confidentially and Conditionally Under Seal the Supplemental Declaration)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice (of Errata of City of Pasadena's Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/10/2019)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Order (re: Defendant City of Pasadena's Motion for a Protective Order)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Terminating Sanctions)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Reply (to Motion to Compel Neuropsychological Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (Re Plaintiff's Motion for Terminating, Issues, and/or Evidentiary Sanctions)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Independent Neur...))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/21/2019)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Notice (PUSD's Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application for Continuance of hearing o...))
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Motion to Sever Cross-Complaints)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice (Errata re Motion to Bifurcate)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Motion to Sever re Plaintiffs)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Motion to Reclassify (Moad))
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Answer (to Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Answer (to Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Opposition (West Coast Arborists, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff A. Palmstrom's Ex-Parte Application)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Compel Merchant's Lanscape Services' Person Most Qualified for Deposition)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Sever Cross-Complaints from Trial of Plaintiffs' Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Bifurcate Liability and Damages)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant City of Pasadena's Ex Parte Application to Compel M...))
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Consolidate Motions)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Order (re Ex Parte App to Consolidate Motions)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Pasadena Unified School District's Ex-Parte Applica...))
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant City of Pasadena's Ex-Parte Application to Compel M...))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#8 to preclude Chris Falco report (08-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#9 to preclude any claim of spoliation of evidence by PUSD or City (8-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#7 to preclude photos of P taken wihtin 90 days after accident (08-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#6 to preclude police body cam video of the scene as police responded (08-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#3 to preclude paramedics-EMT report as hearsay (8-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#4 to preclude all hearsay stmts re prior tree incidents (8-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#2 to preclude contents and substance of police report (8-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#1 to preclude subsequent remedial measures including tree removal (8-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #13 to preclude reference to golden rule, reptile theory argument (8-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#11 to preclude testimony by retained experts (8-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#10 to preclude reference to cross-complaints filed in this action (8-12-19))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (in Limine Nos. 2, 3, 4, 6, 8 and 10)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 to Exclude Opinions of Other Experts as Hearsay)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 to Bar Expert Opinion)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 21)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE FINANCIAL CONDITION OF PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 11 re Prior Lawsuits)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Exhibit B and C)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9 To Exclude Images of Plaintiff's Injuryies)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 19 Mild Traumatic Brain Injury Phrase)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 18 to Preclude Cumulative Witness Testimony)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 16 to Exclude Testimony Regarding Past Tree Failures)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 17 to Preclude Cumulative Evidence)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No . 15 to Exclude Tree Report)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 13 to Exclude Evidence of Past Tree Failures)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 14 to Preclude Expert Speculation)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 12 to Exclude Evidence Not Produced in Discovery)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 11 to Preclude Demonstrative Evidence at Closing)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9 to Exclude Evidence Relating to Liability Insurance)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10 to Limit Experts Testimony)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Defendant West Coast Arborists, Inc's AMENDED Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 to Exclude Testimony)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 20 to Exclude Witness Testimony Regarding Past Tree Failures)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 to Preclude Evidence at Opening)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice (RE PLAINTIFFS' STIPULATION TO WEST COAST ARBORISTS, INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 2 AND 3)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5 Precluding Plaintiff's Counsel from Violating "Golden Rule")
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6 to Preclude Evidence and Testimony)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 to Exclude Witness from Courtroom)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 16 to Exclude Claim of Spoilation of Evidence)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 12 to Exclude City's Confidential Communications)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Ex. B and C to MIL No. 9)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to Limit Plaintiffs' Recovery for Medical Bills)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 14)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Order (Granting Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 17 Re Prior Tree Complaints)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Receipt (jury fees by defendant )
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (Linda Vista Children's Center's Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Answer to Complaint (by Linda Vista Children's Center )
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Cross-complaint
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Answer to Complaint ( Merchants Landscape Services Inc)
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00CIVIL DEPOSIT: $150
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT: $150 )
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Cross-complaint
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 15 Re Falco Report)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Con...))
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Opposition)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgement)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Notice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Opposition (to City of Pasadena's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Evidence in Support of Opposition
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (Linda Vista Children's Center's Motion in Limine Nos. 1,3,5,7,10,11,12,14,17,18)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Objection (in Support of Opposition)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Opposition (to West Coast Arborists' Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Declaration (PUSD Attorney Declaration with Exhibits (8-16-19))
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Pasadena USD's Motion in Limine Nos. 1,2,3,4,5,6,7,8,9,10,11,13)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 22 to Limit Evidence of Plaintiffs' Economic Losses)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to West Coast Arborists' Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Evidence in Support of Opposition
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Linda Vista Children's Center's Motion for Summary)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Objection (in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte to File X-C Liberty Mutual Insurance (08-21-19))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings Defendant Pasadena Unified School Distri...))
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Pasadena Unified School District's Motion to Bifurcate Liability and Damages)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Objection (to WCA's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Reply (to Linda Vista Children's Center's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Objection (to City of Pasadena's Evidence to WCA's Motion for Summary Judgment; Proposed Order)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Declaration (in Opposition to West Coast Motion for Summary Judgment with Exhibits Attached)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Reply (to City of Pasadena's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Opposition (to West Coast Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Reply (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment by defendant West Coas...))
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 23 to Exclude Evidence of Settlements)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 25 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Linda Vista Playground Renovation)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Pasadena Unified School District's Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant City of Pasadena's ...))
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Reply (by City of Pasadena to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration))
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 21 to Preclude Any Testimony)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion in Limine No. 17)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SC...))
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Hearing on M...))
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re: Motion for Leave)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Witness List (Joint by Plaintiff Palmstrom and Defendant/Cross Complainant City of Pasadena)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Trial Brief of City of Pasadena Regarding Participation in the Palmstrom Trial
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel DEF PUSD'S NOTICE OF MOT. AND MOT...))
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF ROBERT GLASSMAN)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel DEF PUSD'S NOTICE OF MOT. AND MOT...))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Declaration (OF KATHY D?ANDREA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Declaration (OF JANIE HO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant Linda Vista Childre...))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Linda Vis...))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Order (re: LVCC's Motion for Summary Judgment Against PUSD's Cross-complaint)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/17/2019)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions filed by defendant West Coast...))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/23/2019)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re Court Denial of LVCC Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Response in Opposition to Pasadena Unified School District's Notice of Related Cases
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Hearing on Motion in Limine by all parties; Heari...))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Hearing on Motion in Limine by all parties))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings CITY OF PASADENA'S Ex Parte Application ...))
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re: Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice (of Advancement of Hearing Date)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling of Hearing Date re PUSD's MTC Depositions)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Reply to Opposition to Motion to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice (of Motion for Issuance of Protective Order)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Compel Further Responses Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (Declaration of Jacqueline)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Nancy Doumanian in Supp of MSJ)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Informal Discovery Conference Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Reply (to Motion for Protective Order and Reuest for Evidentiary and/or Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Inform...))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Court's Order re: Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Kathy D'Andrea in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Janie Ho in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Declaration (In Support Of Defendant/Cross defendants Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference as to the pleadings and Informal Discovery;...))
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Objection (to Merchants Landscape Services, Inc. Certain Evidence)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion for Protective Order Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order by defendant City of P...))
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF PALMSTROM TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Opposition (in part and joinder in part regading Plaintiffs Motion for Terminating Sanctions)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/07/2020)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions and Recover Costs and Reasona...))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice (of Opening or Changing a Guardianship or Conservatorship Account or Safe-Deposit Box)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL (- Clerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); S...))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re 2/18/20 Court Hearing)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs (With Proof of Service)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Judgment (re Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service for Notice of Appeal
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/08/2020)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO ADVANCE HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; [PROPOSED] ORDER
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Appeal by Pasadena Unified School Distr...))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Order (Court's Order re: Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Motion to Tax/Strike Costs filed ...))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/18/2020)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Appeal by Pasadena Unified School District))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of: Other Order)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Partial)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Cross-Complaint of Linda Vi...))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment filed by Attorney for Def...))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Order (Court's Order re: Motion to Amend Judgment)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/01/2021)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of the Complaint by Adelaid...))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (Proposed Judgment on Costs)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Excerpts of Witness Depositions)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Discovery Between WCA and Pasadena Unified School District)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Discovery Between West Coast Arborists and Merchants Landscape Services)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Discovery Between West Coast Arborists, Inc. and Plaintiff's)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Discovery Between West Coast Arborists and City of Pasadena)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Request Court Execution of...))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Nancy Doumanian in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike Costs)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike Costs)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Order (Court's Order re: West Coast Arborists, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Proposed Judgment on Costs)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Motion to Strike Proposed Judgmen...))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AND ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR COURT ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE TIMELY MEMORANDUM OF COSTS)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Court Order Granting Leav...))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Striking Memorandum...))
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Appeal by Pasadena Unified School Distr...))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Brief (Re: Order to Show Cause Re: Whether to Lift the Stay on Execution of the Judgment)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Whether or not to lift the stay on th...))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/22/2021)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement (conditional)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 18, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 22, 2021Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B305052; NA03.08.20;)
Date: October 25, 2021Exhibit List
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 19
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 20
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Reply ( to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Kay Greeley)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Opposition (BY DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PLAINITFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Opposition (BY DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Opposition (BY DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Opposition (BY DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Opposition (BY DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Opposition (BY DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Pasadena Unified Schoo...))
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant Pasadena Unified School District's Late Filing of Reply Papers)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT MOTION IN LIMINE #21 FOR ORDER EXCLUDING CUMULATIVE WITNESSES
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Order (re: Defendant West Coast Arborist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) (Linda Vista Children's Center)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgme...))
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Allow Rehearing or Further Briefing on Summary Judgment Motion)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Order (re: Defendant PUSD's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings Defendant Pasadena Unified School Distri...))
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Order (re: Motions for Determination of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: LINDA VISTA CHILDREN?S CENTER?S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (/ File First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Motion and Motion to Tax Costs Hearing)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B305052, NOA 03/18/20;)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/14/2020)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Nancy Doumanian)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Motion to Reclassify
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Motion to Sever
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Motion to Reclassify
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B305052, NOA 03/18/20;)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.