Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cordon Ana, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Azizi David Esq., Ghermezian Raymond Esq., against Pacific Alliance Medical Center Msj Granted 11 05 18, Xia Sean M.D., represented by Mcmahon Raymond J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pacific Alliance Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Ana Cordon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Ana Cordon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: SEAN X. SIE . sued as SIA M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: February 25, 2020Jury Instructions
Date: February 25, 2020Exhibit List
Date: February 25, 2020Witness List
Date: February 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE ...)
Date: February 28, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: June 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: June 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WI...)
Date: February 01, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 12, 2022Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: April 13, 2022Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: April 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: May 11, 2022Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: May 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 19, 2022Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: May 20, 2022Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: May 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: June 15, 2022Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: June 15, 2022Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED, FEES WERE WAIVED
Date: October 06, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: October 10, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 10, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Pacific Alliance Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ana Cordon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ana Cordon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: SEAN X. SIE . sued as SIA M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Declaration Raymond ghermezian; Filed by: Ana Cordon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Declaration decl of gloria ruiz in support of msj; Filed by: Pacific Alliance Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration decl of david klehm in support of msj; Filed by: Pacific Alliance Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SEAN X. SIE . sued as SIA M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: SEAN X. SIE . sued as SIA M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: SEAN X. SIE . sued as SIA M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Pacific Alliance Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Order By the Court granting Defendant's Unopposed Motions to Compel; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: SEAN X. SIE . sued as SIA M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ana Cordon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Pacific ...))
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Declaration (decl of david klehm in support of msj)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Order (RE: PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT, TRIAL AND RELATED DATES)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (decl of gloria ruiz in support of msj)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's Ex Parte Applicat...))
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Cary Alberstone, M.D. in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order to Continue Defe...))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order to continue the ...))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and All Rel...))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10 of Defendant Sean Xie, M.D. re Experts' Personal Practices)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Prosecute wi...))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Taking Defendant Sean Xie, M.D.'s Motion for Summary Judgment off calendar)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Response (Response and Objection to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Order (By the Court granting Defendant's Unopposed Motions to Compel)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Declaration (Raymond ghermezian)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel answers; Hearing on Motion to Com...))
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Declaration (decl of david klehm in support of msj)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (decl of gloria ruiz in support of msj)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (decl of gary painter in support of msj)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's Ex Parte Applicat...))
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Defendant's Notice of Lodging of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Cary Alberstone, M.D. in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Pacific ...))
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order to Continue Defe...))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Taking Defendant Sean Xie, M.D.'s Motion for Summary Judgment off calendar)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order to continue the ...))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel answers; Hearing on Motion to Com...))
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Declaration (Raymond ghermezian)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Order (By the Court granting Defendant's Unopposed Motions to Compel)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Defendant's Notice of Lodging of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (decl of gary painter in support of msj)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10 of Defendant Sean Xie, M.D. re Experts' Personal Practices)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Order (RE: PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT, TRIAL AND RELATED DATES)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Prosecute wi...))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.