Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bellinger Eric, Bellinger Sheena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stoll Robert J. Iii Esq., against Ean Holdings Llc, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company Of Doe 1, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company Of Los Angeles Llc, Hooper Shedena Zakiyyah, (total of 7) See All represented by Boyd Kurt, Brecht Celeste M, Luper Ramanda R., Popovich Jerry C. Esq., Stephan Paul E., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Deirdre Hill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Robert J Stoll, III (Attorney)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: National Tour Integrated Resources, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shedena Zakiyyah Hooper (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: National Tour Integrated Resources, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: National Tour Integrated Resources, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Motion to Quash subpoena of High School Records; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Reply to Motion to Quash Subpoena to Brian Rudin, MD; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Reply to Motion to Quash Subpoena to Medical Specialty Managers; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Reply to Motion to Quash Subpoena to Taura Olfus, DO; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Shedena Zakiyyah Hooper (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shedena Zakiyyah Hooper (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shedena Zakiyyah Hooper (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Shedena Zakiyyah Hooper (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: National Tour Integrated Resources, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Sheena Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Sheena Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Eric Bellinger; Filed by: Sheena Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: National Tour Integrated Resources, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: National Tour Integrated Resources, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Robert J. Stoll; Filed by: Sheena Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Tracey Rangel Cruz; Filed by: Sheena Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash (subpoena of High School Records)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash (Legacy)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Reply to Motion to Quash Subpoena to Regal Medical Group; Filed by: Eric Bellinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Opposition OPPOSITION TO PLANTIFFS MOTION; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of Two (2) Informal Discovery Conference Forms etc.
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Quash (subpoena as to United Healthcare Services)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Motion to Quash (subpoena as to Dr. Taura Olfus)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash (subpoena as to Regal Medical Group)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Reply ([Plaintiff's] to His Motion to Quash Defendant Enterprise Rent-A-Car's Subpoenas.....)
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Quash (Legacy)))
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash (Legacy)) of 01/07/2019)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Quash (records of Landmark Imaging)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash (subpoena as to Dr. Brian Ruden)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena as to Dr. Todd Gavori)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/10/2019)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash (subpoena as to Medical Specialty Managers)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing Date)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Assignment and Notice of CMC)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of MTQ Hearings)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and/or Motion and Trial Setting Co...))
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of MTC Hearings)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice (of All Hearings on Calendar)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Informal Discovery Confe...))
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLANTIFFS MOTION)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Reply (to Motion to Compel Further Responses to RFPs - Enterprise 4-5-19)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Motion to Compel Further Responses to SROGs - Enterprise)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to MOtion for protective order)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Notice ( of Taking MTC Off-Calendar and of Continuing Hearing Dates Re MTQ)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Reply ( to Motion to Quash Subpoena to Medical Specialty Managers)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Reply ( to Motion to Quash Subpoena to United Healthcare Services Inc)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Reply ( to Motion to Quash Subpoena to Brian Rudin, MD)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Reply ( to Motion to Quash Subpoena to Taura Olfus, DO)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Reply ( to Motion to Quash Subpoena to Landmark Imaging Surgery Center)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Reply ( to Motion to Quash Subpoena to Regal Medical Group)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena to Landmark Imaging Surge...))
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and/or Motion and Trial Setting Co...))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Person Most Qualifi...))
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Objection ( of Objection to Service by Fax & Email)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's Motion)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Deposition Transcript in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Objection to Notice of Taking Deposition and Request to Produce
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Advancing Hearing Date)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Relief)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Relief; Hearing on Ex Par...))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Enterprise's Ex Parte to Continue Trial and Allow CCP Sec. 2034)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial; Hearing on Motion for Le...))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Relief; Hearing on Ex Par...))
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related case and Stipulation to con...))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF HEARINGS ON PLAINTIFF?S MOTIONS
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion; Filed by: National Tour Integrated Resources, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00DECLARATION OF AMANDA D. MURRAY; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT(S) OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER SPECIAL INTERROGATORY RESPONSE(S))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT(S) OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER SPECIAL INTERROGATORY RESPONSE(S))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuance))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: continuance) of 04/23/2020)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to motion to compel further answers to Judicial form interrogatory responses)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER SUPPLEMENTAL PRODUCTION REQUEST RESPONSE(S))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Request for Production Motion)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY RESPONSE(S))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition Request for Production Motion)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate; Trial Readiness Conference))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawing Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00DECLARATION OF AMANDA D. MURRAY
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff Eric Bellinger's Opposition to Sanctions Request in Motions To Compel)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Robert J. Stoll)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff Sheena Bellinger's Opposition to Sanctions Request in Motions To Compe)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Response (Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Separate Statement of Allegedly Undisputed Facts)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Tracey Rangel Cruz)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Eric Bellinger)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Reply (Def. Enterprise's Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Reply (Def. Enterprise's Reply Separate Statement ISO Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Written Discovery; H...))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Continuing Trial)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 Exclude References to Trial Continuances)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5 Exclude Evidence of Settlement Offers)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 Exclude Negligent Hiring)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 Exclude Future Lost Earnings)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9 Exclude Reference to Corp Rep.)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 to Exclude Video of the Accident)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 Exclude References to Defense Counsel)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6 Exclude Evidence of Liability Insurance)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 Exclude Evidence of Consortium)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 07, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.