Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Randhawa Mandeep, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Kahen Kashani Jacob K., against General Motors Llc, represented by Arens Mary Lynn Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mel Red Recana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY ;ETC
Date: January 26, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: January 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: February 09, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 11, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 07, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 10, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: July 10, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 12, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 27, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: May 16, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: May 28, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00
Date: August 27, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: May 16, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 05/28/2019)
Date: May 28, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.