Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Andrew Stroud, Estate Of Caterhine Yi Deceased, Jason Lee, John Moss, Lee Jason, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jorgensen Richard A., Lesser & Associates Plc Richard Lesser, Lesser Richard A., Lesser Richard Allen, Jorgensen & Salberg Llp, (total of 8) See All against Anthony Falzone, Catalina Divers Supply, Catalina Divers Supply Llc, C & N Ins Inc., Does 1 To 100, (total of 18) See All represented by Cox Wootton Lerner Griffin & Hansen Llp, La Follette Johnson De Haas Fesler & Ames, La Follette Johnson Dehaas Fesler & Ames, Lafollette Johnson Dehaas Fesler & Ames, Nelson & Griffin, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management103 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc South District |
Case Cycle Time74 days |
COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY UNDER GENERAL MARITIME LAW
Date: January 29, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: January 29, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: February 20, 2018FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY UNDER GENERAL MARJTIME LAW
Date: February 20, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 08, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 13, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 19, 2018NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: March 21, 2018CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET
Date: March 21, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: March 21, 2018CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET
Date: March 22, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: March 22, 2018NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: March 22, 2018CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET
Date: April 02, 2018NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: April 02, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 12, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-04-12 00:00:00
Date: April 12, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion
Date: April 12, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation
Date: April 12, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 19, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: April 19, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: April 20, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: April 24, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: April 24, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: April 25, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-05-11 00:00:00
Date: May 11, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: May 14, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: May 23, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: May 21, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 12, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: July 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Lodging - EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 19, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 19, 2019Notice - Notice of Change of Address
Date: July 03, 2018Declaration -
Date: July 06, 2018Other - - PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE
Date: July 09, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00
Date: July 09, 2018Opposition -
Date: July 13, 2018Notice of Ruling -
Date: July 16, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-07-17 00:00:00
Date: July 17, 2018Other - - Peremptory Challenge
Date: July 17, 2018Notice of Ruling -
Date: July 31, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference -
Date: August 08, 2018Other - - Case Management Statement
Date: August 16, 2018Other - - Case Management Statement
Date: August 23, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: August 24, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: August 23, 2018Stipulation - No Order -
Date: September 07, 2018Joinder -
Date: September 17, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: September 10, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: September 12, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: September 18, 2018Notice of Joinder -
Date: September 18, 2018Ex Parte Application -
Date: September 18, 2018Notice -
Date: September 24, 2018Notice -
Date: September 20, 2018Reply - Reply To The Plaintiffs' Collective Opposition To Defendants Motion To Strike
Date: December 28, 2018Reply - Reply To The Plaintiffs' Collective Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Strike
Date: December 31, 2018Reply - Reply To The Plaintiffs' Collective Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Strike
Date: January 02, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: January 10, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: January 11, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: January 17, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 17, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: January 17, 2019Notice - Notice Notice of removal of actions to federal court
Date: January 24, 2019Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CASE NUMBER BC691641
Date: June 21, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 28, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 02, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF VACATING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES
Date: July 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 19, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 20, 2021Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 02, 2021Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Declaration of Bill N. Oliver; Filed by: ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: JASON LEE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: December 19, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 19, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 19, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 19, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 20, 2019Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: June 21, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Stipulation (TO TRANSFER PI CASE TO IC COURT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Declaration of Jorge A. Lopez, Esq. Filed by: ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Scuba Mania, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory (DEF SCUBA MANIA'S 170.6- JUDGE KIM ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ANTHONY FALZONE (Defendant); RANDY SMITH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Statement-Case Management (Defendant's CMC for ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Scuba Mania, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Nancy Lee (Plaintiff); Lee Jason (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by JAMES GRUNDY (Defendant); JOHN MOSS (Defendant); Scuba Mania, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Joinder Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nancy Lee (Plaintiff); Lee Jason (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Notice Filed by LAFOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Nancy Lee (Petitioner); Jason Lee (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice (OF CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion to Transfer Filed by James Grundy (Defendant); John Moss (Defendant); Scuba Mania Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Transfer Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Nancy Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory (AGAINJST JUDGE VICENCIA FILED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: JASON LEE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 27, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/27/2020
Date: April 27, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: May 28, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JORGE A. LOPEZ, ESQ.
Date: June 09, 2020Separate Statement
Date: June 09, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF BILL N. OLIVER
Date: June 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: June 09, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 09, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION
Date: June 18, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: June 18, 2020Reply - REPLY TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 18, 2020Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL UNDISPUTED FACTS
Date: June 18, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF COURT CALL APPEARANCE
Date: June 19, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: June 23, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION TO COMPEL OPPOSITION OF ERIC MAHAN
Date: August 07, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 27, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 11, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HEARING ON MOTION FOR...)
Date: September 16, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HEARING ON MOTION FOR...)
Date: September 23, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 25, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 09/30/2020
Date: September 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Change of Address; Filed by: Nancy Lee (Petitioner); Jason Lee (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Lee Jason (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Lee Jason (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ANTHONY FALZONE (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff); JOHN MOSS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Memorandum - Other (OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES, ETC... ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: JASON LEE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by COX WOOTTON LERNER GRIFFIN & HANSEN LLP (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Motion (*FALZONE & SMITH* TO TRANSFER PI CASE TO IC COURT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (BC691786, DEPT. 92 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON SCUBA MANIA'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF NEIL S. LERNER, ETC... ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Nancy Lee (Petitioner); Jason Lee (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by NELSON GRIFFIN LLP (RAYMOND MURO) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL NEIL LERNER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Partial) Filed by JASON LEE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ANTHONY FALZONE (Defendant); RANDY SMITH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by LAFOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF FIRST COMPLAINT, ETC... ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Opposition Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE TRANSFER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Address) Filed by Nancy Lee (Petitioner); Jason Lee (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Jorge A. Lopez, Esq.) Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (on case number BC691786 (Partial)) Filed by Lee Jason (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff); ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Bill N. Oliver) Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Joinder Filed by C & N INS INC. (Defendant); CATALINA DIVERS SUPPLY, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Nancy Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lee Jason (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by JASON LEE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: March 02, 2021Separate Statement Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Document:Points & Authorities Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF COURT CALL APPEARANCE) Filed by JASON LEE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by:
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by JASON LEE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Stipulation (TO TRANSFER CASE TO IC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by CATALINA DIVERS SUPPLY, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Statement-Case Management (DEF SCUBA MANIA'S CMC FOR 5-11-18 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Notice (ON PLAINTIFF ANDREW STROUD'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Motion (*SCUBA MANIA* TO TRANSFER PI CASE TO IC COURT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice (OF NEW HEARING DATE ON DEFS MTN TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice ( of Vacating Final Status Conference and Trial Dates) Filed by Lee Jason (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice Filed by SCUBA MANIA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by ANDREW STROUD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by JASON LEE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by C & N Lins Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00First Amended Compliant for Personal Injury Under General Maritime Law
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Transfer
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Motion to Transfer
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF FIRST COMPLAINT, ETC... )
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Declaration (OF NEIL S. LERNER, ETC... )
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Memorandum - Other (OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES, ETC... )
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET )
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET )
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (BC691786, DEPT. 92 )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET - F/O/B C & N LINS INC. )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Motion (*FALZONE & SMITH* TO TRANSFER PI CASE TO IC COURT )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Stipulation (TO TRANSFER CASE TO IC )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Stipulation (TO TRANSFER PI CASE TO IC COURT )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Motion (*SCUBA MANIA* TO TRANSFER PI CASE TO IC COURT )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE TRANSFER )
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Notice (OF CMC )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Statement-Case Management (DEF SCUBA MANIA'S CMC FOR 5-11-18 )
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Statement-Case Management (PLNTF- STROUD CMC STATMENT 5-11-18 ATTY - JORGENSEN & SALBERG LLP)
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Statement-Case Management (Defendant's CMC for 5/11/18 )
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Statement-Case Management (FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFT., C & N LINS INC., dba CATALINA DIVERS SUPPLY )
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Notice (OF NEW HEARING DATE ON DEFS MTN TO STRIKE )
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL NEIL LERNER )
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Address)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by COX WOOTTON LERNER GRIFFIN & HANSEN LLP (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LAFOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ANTHONY FALZONE (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Lee Jason (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory (DEF SCUBA MANIA'S 170.6- JUDGE KIM )
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON SCUBA MANIA'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED )
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory (AGAINJST JUDGE VICENCIA FILED )
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Notice (ON PLAINTIFF ANDREW STROUD'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED )
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Reply (To The Plaintiffs' Collective Opposition To Defendants Motion To Strike)
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Reply (To The Plaintiffs' Collective Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Strike)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not ...))
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Reply (To The Plaintiffs' Collective Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Strike)
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 06/28/2019)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (on case number BC691786 (Partial))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 07/12/2019)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court (and Request for Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice ( of Vacating Final Status Conference and Trial Dates)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Exhibits in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Thomas J. Griffin in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/27/2020)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Jorge A. Lopez, Esq.)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Reply (to Separate Statement of additional undisputed Material Facts)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF COURT CALL APPEARANCE)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Plaintiffs Jason and Nancy Lee's amended notice of ruling following status conference
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Bill N. Oliver)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Compel Opposition of Eric Mahan)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Reply (In support of Motion for Summary Judgment or Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/30/2020)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.