Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Monaghan Dominic, filed a(n) Negligent Breach - Commercial case represented by Carvalho Arthur Jr, against Luis Bruce De, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2018 |
CategoryNegligent Breach Of Contract/Warranty (No Fraud) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeNegligent Breach |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time409 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Total Costs: 500.00
Date: March 06, 2019Document:Declaration of Diligence Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Default entered as to Bruce De Luis; On the Complaint filed by DOMINIC MONAGHAN on
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Default Judgment Prove Up package; Filed by: Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: March 06, 2019COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; (2) NEGLIGENCE; AND (3) RESCISSION
Date: January 22, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: January 22, 2018Minute Order -
Date: January 30, 2018DECLARATION RE DILIGENCE
Date: February 27, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 27, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: March 06, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 06, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 04, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: April 04, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 04, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: June 28, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 29, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 02, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause)
Date: October 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry of default and default judg...)
Date: February 15, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 06, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: March 06, 2019Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE UP PACKAGE
Date: March 06, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry of default and default judg...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Default Judgment (Prove Up package) Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter taken under submission )) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (as to BRUCE DE LUIS) Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Order Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Dominic Monaghan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry of default and default judg...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (as to BRUCE DE LUIS)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Default Judgment (Prove Up package)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry of default and default judg...))
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: entry of default and default judg...))
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter taken under submission 2/15/19))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.