Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Marshall Tyrone, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case against Acsb Llc, Aspen Skilled Heallthcare Inc, Marina Pinte Healthcare & Subacute, Marina Pointer Subacute & Rehabilitation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2018 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time229 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: January 19, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION
Date: January 19, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 26, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 01, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: May 14, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 17, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 17, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: May 30, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 04, 2018NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE
Date: August 24, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: September 18, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: May 28, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 18, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.