Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jcr Law Group, Jcr Law Group A California Corporation, Rosen Jonathan C., Rosen Jonathan C. Dba Law Office Of Jonathan C. Rosen, Law Office Of Jonathan C. Rosen, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Knobler J. David, Reicheneder Dale, Sanders Marshall Curtis, Zelig Steven, Wla Legal Services Inc., (total of 5) See All against Aguilar Arturo, Does 1 To 100, Moorhead James, Reicheneder Dale, Reichneneder Law Group, (total of 5) See All represented by Reicheneder Dale, Ronald J. Seeley Law Office Of, Steven D. Davis Law Group Apc, Seeley Ronald J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard Fruin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management386 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc Nc Dist.-Glendale |
Case Cycle Time106 days |
Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 425.16
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Notice (of Pending Writ)
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING OF ORDER VACATING ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO JUVENILE COURT CASE FILE
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Jury Fee Deposit by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (related to EC064392 )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Declaration (of James Moorhead)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U")
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Compelling James Moorhead to Attend His Deposition)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (B293942;)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Status Conference)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF REINSTATED ORDER VACATING ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO JUVENILE COURT CASE FILE
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00BACKGROUND AND OVERVIEW
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONT DEFT'S ANTI-S.L.A.P.P. MOTION )
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Dale Reicheneder )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal ("U"; N.O.A. )
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Dale Reicheneder)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Pltff JC...))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice (of ERRATA)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (of Ruling)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing (ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFCATION; VERIFIED ANSWER; )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing - Attachment
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Order (ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Response (and Declaration Opposing Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE PLTFS' EX PARTE APPL TO CONT HRG ON SPECIAL MTN TO STRIKE )
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Request-Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Reply to Motion (REPLY MEMORANDUM RE ANTI-SLAPP MOTION )
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND RESPONSE BY DEFENDANTS TO OSC RE RELATED CASE
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Moorhead's Demurrer and Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00REPLY MEMORANDUM RE ANTI-SLAPP MOTION
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Statement (STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND RESPOSE BY DEFTS TO OSC RE RELATED CASE )
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice (OF PENDING WRIT )
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S ANTI-S.L.A.P.P. MOTION
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Order Forma Pauperis
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING OF ORDER VACATING ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO JUVENILE COURT CASE FILE )
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Allowing Plainti...))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RULINGS )
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by JCR Law ...))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re CHANGE OF HEARING FROM DEC. 04, 2020 TO DEC. 1...))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Marshall C. Sanders in Response and Opposition to [Proposed] Order, etc.)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U")
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U")
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Demurrer to Unverified Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF REINSTATED ORDER VACATING SEPTEMBER 3, 2015 ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO JUVENILE COURT CASE FILE
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Response (to Plaintiffs Response to Courts Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Notice (OF REINSSTATED ORDER VACATING ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO JUVENILE COURT CASE FILE )
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Plaintiff's counsel Medical condition an...))
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Jury Fee Deposit by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Aguilar's Demurrer and Motion to Strike the First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice (of refilling first amended complaint)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF AUGUST 4, 2020)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Or Order)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Artur...))
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Response (to Plaintiffs opposition to defendants motion to dismiss and request for costs and sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Response (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Complaint ((2nd))
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Order (Continuing Trial, Final Status Confernce and Resetting Cut-off dates)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered (NOA 3-8-21, 2-VOL CLKS)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Request for Court Reporting Services by a Party with Fee Waiver for Hearing
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial and Related...))
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, Final Stat...))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SET ON JULY 16, 2020 TO...))
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B293942)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss (Defendant's Request for Costs, Defendant's Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Post Appeal Status Conference)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Response (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice (of Appellate Court?s Ruling DENYING Plaintiff Jonathan C. Rosen, Esq.?s Petition for Rehearing)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Re: Status of Plaintiff's Appeal of the Court's Ru...))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Response to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00in Department A Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Filed by Deft James Moorhead) - Held - Motion Denied
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Re: Status of Plaintiff's Appeal of the Court's Ru...))
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING W...))
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Response to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Response (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Service by a Party with Fee Waiver for Hearing on
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SET ON JULY 16, 2020 TO...) of )
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss (Defendant's Request for Costs, Defendant's Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00in Department A Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (Filed by Deft James Moorhead) - Held
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Re: Status of Plaintiff's Appeal of the Court's Ru...))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- (for Notice of Appeal, filed ; "U"; B311689)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice (of Defendant Dale Reicheneder?s Phone Number)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearings on Motio...))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other on Response and Opposition by Plaintiffs to D...))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Objection (to Status Report Filed by Defendant James Moorhead)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling James...))
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Response (to Plaintiffs Response to Courts Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Deft Reicheneder...))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; DECLARATION OF EVAN SELIK; DECLARATION OF STEVEN ZELIG)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Tax and/or Strike Cost Bill)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (- Electronic Service)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA (CORRECTED))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Order (To show Cause Re: Dismissal)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver (for Hearings on July 29, 2022 @ 8:30 am)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (Answer of Arturo Aguilar)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed ((B311689))
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs (Filed By Arturo Aguilar)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Abandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145
Date: July 11, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Or Order)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Motion to Augment (Response to Motion for Attorney's Fees by Deposing DALE REICHENEDER and RON S SEELEY)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00in Department A Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (Filed by Deft Arturo Aguilar) - Held - Continued
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Reply (to Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Objection (TO DECLARATION OF JAMES MOORHEAD)
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Deft Arturo Aguilar; ...))
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver (for Hearing )
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U1")
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-06 00:00:00
Date: June 06, 2018Notice -
Date: July 20, 2018Notice -
Date: July 16, 2018Declaration -
Date: August 20, 2018Notice of Motion - MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' NON VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2018Request - FOR DEMURRER
Date: August 20, 2018Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) -
Date: August 20, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike -
Date: August 20, 2018Other - - BACKGROUND AND OVERVIEW
Date: August 20, 2018Proof of Personal Service -
Date: August 23, 2018Order - ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 20, 2018Stipulation - No Order - TO CONTINUE HEARING
Date: September 12, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service -
Date: September 17, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: September 20, 2018Amended Complaint - FIRSI
Date: September 28, 2018Response - to first amended complaint
Date: October 05, 2018Notice - of withdrawal of first amended complaint (until anti-slap motion is heard)
Date: October 05, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - first amended complaint
Date: October 10, 2018Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore -
Date: October 12, 2018Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: October 12, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)
Date: October 12, 2018Notice - Notice of refilling first amended complaint
Date: October 22, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT'S RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: October 26, 2018Request For Copies
Date: October 29, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) and ...)
Date: November 02, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: November 05, 2018Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Default
Date: December 11, 2018Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: November 20, 2018Request For Copies
Date: December 24, 2018Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: December 21, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 10, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 18, 2019Response - Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: January 22, 2019Opposition - Opposition to Moorhead's Demurrer and Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint
Date: January 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 23, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re Case Management Conference)
Date: February 01, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference is continued to and/or; Hearing on...)
Date: February 01, 2019Answer - Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: March 01, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION RONALD J. SEELEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED
Date: January 30, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: January 30, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 26, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: July 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF POST APPEAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: July 13, 2020Motion to Tax Costs
Date: July 30, 2020First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice (of withdrawal of first amended complaint (until anti-slap motion is heard))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal (Order reinstating appeal filed )
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Objection (TO DECLARATION OF JAMES MOORHEAD)
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) and ...))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((COURT'S RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference is continued to and/or; Hearing on...))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Declaration (Ronald J. Seeley in Support of Motion to be Relieved)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Reply (to Arturo Aguilar's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Tax Costs to the Extent It Alleges Facts)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Response (to first amended complaint)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00in Department A Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Filed by Deft Arturo Aguilar) - Held - Motion Denied
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- (With Proof of Service "U1")
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Deft Arturo Aguilar; ...) of )
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (U1)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver (for Ex Parte Hearing )
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Related dates)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00DECLARATION OF MARSHALL C. SANDERS IN RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTARY DECLARATION JAMES MOORHEAD
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed (No Proof of Service "U1")
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 03, 2023Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified (N.O.A. ; B311689; 3 VOL)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00PROOF Of SERVICE of NOTICE OF RULING
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice (and Lodging of Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings of September 2, 2022)
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Deft James Moorhead; ...))
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal (U1)
Date: July 12, 2023Response (to Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Statement As Ordered By Honorable Judge Anthony Mohr For Upcoming Status Conference of May 27, 2022
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Request (for Court Reporter Services by a Party with a Fee Waiver for 8:30 am Ex Parte)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by a Party with a Fee Waiver for 8:30 am Ex Parte
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel deft, Arturo Aguila...))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, Final Status Conference and Reset Cut-off dates)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Request for Court Reporting Services by a Party with a Fee Waiver for 8:30 am Ex Parte
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATORY, AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES; AND, REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY
Date: January 11, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: January 11, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: March 19, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 20, 2018NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: April 02, 2018REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: April 02, 2018DECLARATION OF DALE REICHENEDER IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 02, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 13, 2018REPLY MEMORANDUM RE ANTI-SLAPP MOTION
Date: April 23, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 20, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 30, 2018Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF AUGUST 4, 2020
Date: September 10, 2020Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B293942
Date: October 07, 2020Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: October 30, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: October 30, 2020Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: November 06, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: November 10, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX AND/OR STRIKE COST BILL
Date: November 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY JCR LAW ...)
Date: November 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CHANGE OF HEARING FROM DEC. 04, 2020 TO DEC. 1...)
Date: December 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF PLAINTIFF'S APPEAL OF THE COURT'S RU...)
Date: December 11, 2020Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: December 21, 2020Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: December 21, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: December 21, 2020Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: January 27, 2021Request For Copies
Date: January 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARINGS ON MOTIO...)
Date: February 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF DEFENDANT DALE REICHENEDER’S PHONE NUMBER
Date: February 16, 2021Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: May 16, 2022Exhibit List
Date: May 16, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: May 16, 2022Order - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL
Date: May 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 17, 2022Status Report
Date: May 24, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 24, 2022Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND) (AMENDED)
Date: March 11, 2019Request For Copies
Date: March 14, 2019Response - RESPONSE TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 04, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: October 24, 2019Association of Attorney
Date: May 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: May 31, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 01, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: June 07, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 09, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 15, 2022Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 16, 2022Request For Copies
Date: June 16, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: June 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: June 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: June 29, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: July 19, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: August 02, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 20, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: August 03, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) (AMENDED)
Date: August 04, 2022Motion to Tax Costs - MOTION TO TAX COSTS FILED BY ARTURO AGUILAR
Date: August 04, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - (AMENDED)
Date: August 04, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: August 10, 2022Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: August 22, 2022Response - RESPONSE AND DECLARATION OPPOSING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: August 22, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF JAMES MOORHEAD
Date: August 26, 2022Reply - REPLY TO RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: August 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS FILED BY DEFT JAMES MOORHEAD; ...)
Date: September 02, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: September 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS FILED BY DEFT ARTURO AGUILAR; ...)
Date: September 21, 2022Notice - NOTICE AND LODGING OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF SEPTEMBER 2, 2022
Date: September 27, 2022Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL "U1"
Date: September 29, 2022Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED U1
Date: October 26, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: January 11, 2023Abandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145
Date: July 11, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: March 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA (CORRECTED)
Date: March 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 27, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/27/2021
Date: April 27, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 03, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "U"
Date: June 29, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: August 12, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: August 27, 2021Order - ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERNCE AND RESETTING CUT-OFF DATES
Date: August 30, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 21, 2021Request For Copies
Date: September 28, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES
Date: March 25, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 28, 2022Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: March 29, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 29, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 01, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 12, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: May 12, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO STATUS REPORT FILED BY DEFENDANT JAMES MOORHEAD
Date: May 16, 2022Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Declaration (of James Moorhead)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice (of withdrawal of first amended complaint (until anti-slap motion is heard))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Response (to first amended complaint)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice (of refilling first amended complaint)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Aguilar's Demurrer and Motion to Strike the First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Moorhead's Demurrer and Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Response (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Response (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Response to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Response to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING W...))
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Re: Status of Plaintiff's Appeal of the Court's Ru...))
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Declaration (Ronald J. Seeley in Support of Motion to be Relieved)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Status Conference)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Post Appeal Status Conference)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SET ON JULY 16, 2020 TO...))
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Service by a Party with Fee Waiver for Hearing on 8/4/20
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice (of Appellate Court?s Ruling DENYING Plaintiff Jonathan C. Rosen, Esq.?s Petition for Rehearing)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF AUGUST 4, 2020)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Re: Status of Plaintiff's Appeal of the Court's Ru...))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss (Defendant's Request for Costs, Defendant's Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss (Defendant's Request for Costs, Defendant's Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B293942)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re CHANGE OF HEARING FROM DEC. 04, 2020 TO DEC. 1...))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Tax and/or Strike Cost Bill)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Response (to Plaintiffs opposition to defendants motion to dismiss and request for costs and sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by JCR Law ...))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Re: Status of Plaintiff's Appeal of the Court's Ru...))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Deft Reicheneder...))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; DECLARATION OF EVAN SELIK; DECLARATION OF STEVEN ZELIG)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Pltff JC...))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (- Electronic Service)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearings on Motio...))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U")
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U")
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/27/2021)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Allowing Plainti...))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (of Ruling)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA (CORRECTED))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other on Response and Opposition by Plaintiffs to D...))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice (of Defendant Dale Reicheneder?s Phone Number)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Marshall C. Sanders in Response and Opposition to [Proposed] Order, etc.)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice (of ERRATA)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U")
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, Final Stat...))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel deft, Arturo Aguila...))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Request for Court Reporting Services by a Party with Fee Waiver for Hearing 8/30/21
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal ("U"; N.O.A. 3/8/21)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, Final Status Conference and Reset Cut-off dates)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Order (Continuing Trial, Final Status Confernce and Resetting Cut-off dates)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Dale Reicheneder)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONT DEFT'S ANTI-S.L.A.P.P. MOTION )
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Dale Reicheneder )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (related to EC064392 )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE PLTFS' EX PARTE APPL TO CONT HRG ON SPECIAL MTN TO STRIKE )
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Reply to Motion (REPLY MEMORANDUM RE ANTI-SLAPP MOTION )
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Order (ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing (ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFCATION; VERIFIED ANSWER; )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING OF ORDER VACATING 09/03/15 ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO JUVENILE COURT CASE FILE
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING OF ORDER VACATING 09/03/15 ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO JUVENILE COURT CASE FILE )
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Statement (STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND RESPOSE BY DEFTS TO OSC RE RELATED CASE )
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Notice (OF PENDING WRIT )
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice (of Pending Writ)
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal (Order reinstating appeal filed 11/16/18)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Response (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference is continued to and/or; Hearing on...))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (B293942;)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Complaint ((2nd))
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RULINGS )
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00in Department NCGD, Ralph C. Hofer, Presiding
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice (OF REINSSTATED ORDER VACATING 09/03/15 ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO JUVENILE COURT CASE FILE )
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF REINSTATED ORDER VACATING 09/03/15 ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO JUVENILE COURT CASE FILE
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Demurrer to Unverified Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((COURT'S RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) and ...))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (B293942;)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.