Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martinez Jose, Martinez Leonor, Medina Miguel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Younessi Ramin Ray, against Colbert Dwayne, Medina Miguel, represented by Fuchs John Paul, Gibbs Patrick J, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jose Martinez (Plaintiff); Leonor Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order stip and order to continue trial; Filed by: Dwayne Colbert (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Jose Martinez (Plaintiff); Leonor Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Patrick J Gibbs (Attorney); As to: Dwayne Colbert (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jose Martinez (Plaintiff); Leonor Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. LOSS OF CONSORTIUM
Date: January 11, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: January 11, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 05, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 14, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: March 16, 2018NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 16, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: May 30, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT DWAYNE COLBERT
Date: May 25, 2018CROSS-COMPLAINT INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: May 30, 2018NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS
Date: September 06, 2018DWAYNE COLBERT'S ANSWER TO MIGUEL MEDINA'S CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 22, 2018Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: October 31, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))
Date: October 31, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 02, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/20/2018
Date: November 20, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: November 20, 2018Notice - Notice Of Court's Minute Order
Date: January 07, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: January 11, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: January 14, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: October 01, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: December 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)
Date: December 23, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: January 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020
Date: April 14, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: August 05, 2020Complaint
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/20/2018)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by De...))
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice (Of Court's Minute Order)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by De...))
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (stip and order to continue trial)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 12/23/2019)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue trial)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling on Notice of Settlement)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 4B (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
January 11, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department 4B (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Edward B. Moreton Jr. |
|
October 19, 2020 | Hearing |
in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Jr. |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Address for Ramin Ray Younessi (Attorney) null | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Address for John Paul Fuchs (Attorney) null | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Address for Marshall Alexander Coyle (Attorney) null | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Marshall Alexander Coyle (Attorney): Organization Name: Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP; Middle Name changed from A. to Alexander | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ramin Ray Younessi (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Ofc Ramin R Younessi,A Prof Law Corp to Law Offices of Ramin R. Younessi a Proffesional Law Corporation; Name Suffix: blank | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- John Paul Fuchs (Attorney): Name Suffix: blank |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.