Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Walls Levi C. Jr., filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Williams Andrew S. Esq., against Janssen L.P. Fka Janssen Pharmaceutica Products L.P., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. Fka Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. Fka Ortho-Mcneil Pharmaceutical Products Inc., Janssen Research & Development Llc. Fka Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development L.L.C., Johnson & Johnson, Mckesson Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Hanssen William A., Hudson Rodney M., Trankiem Sarah C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Highberger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2018 |
CategoryClaims Involving Mass Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: MCKESSON CORPORATION (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Levi C. Walls, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: January 10, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) STRICT PRODUCTS LIABILITY ;ETC
Date: January 10, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - -
Date: February 01, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Further Status Conference)
Date: February 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 26, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: August 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON JOINDER TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / ADJUDICAT...)
Date: December 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: August 07, 2020Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons based on lack o...))
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudicat...))
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Re: Settlement))
Date: August 07, 2020Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs as ...))
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.